EP1807506 - MICROENCAPSULATION OF CELLS IN HYDROGELS USING ELECTROSTATIC POTENTIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEORGIA TECH RESEARCH CORPORATION 505 Tenth Street, NW Atlanta, GA 30332-0415 / US | [2007/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYAN, Barbara, Dale 898 Byrnwyck Road NE Atlanta, GA 30319 / US | 02 /
KINNEY, Ramsey Christian 1335 Benning Place NE Apt. 2 Atlanta, GA 30307 / US | 03 /
SCHWARTZ, Zvi 898 Byrnwyck Road NE Atlanta, GA 30319 / US | [2013/16] |
Former [2007/29] | 01 /
BOYAN, Barbara, Dale 898 Byrnwyck Road NE Atlanta, GA 30319 / US | ||
02 /
KINNEY, Ramsey Christian 1335 Benning Place NE, Apt. 2 Atlanta, GA 30307 / US | |||
03 /
SCHWARTZ, Zvi 898 Byrnwyck Road NE Atlanta, GA 30319 / US | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/29] | Walker, Ross Thomson Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05817171.1 | 07.10.2005 | [2007/29] | WO2005US36202 | Priority number, date | US20040617560P | 08.10.2004 Original published format: US 617560 P | [2007/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006042132 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1807506 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1807506 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N11/00, C12N11/04, C12Q1/02 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
C12N5/0655 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C12N5/0012 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/29] | C12N5/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/29] | Title | German: | MIKROVERKAPSELUNG VON ZELLEN IN HYDROGELEN DURCH ELEKTROSTATISCHE POTENTIALE | [2012/41] | English: | MICROENCAPSULATION OF CELLS IN HYDROGELS USING ELECTROSTATIC POTENTIALS | [2007/29] | French: | MICROENCAPSULATION DE CELLULES DANS DES HYDROGELS A L'AIDE DE POTENTIELS ELECTROSTATIQUES | [2007/29] |
Former [2007/29] | MIRKOVERKAPSELUNG VON ZELLEN IN HYDROGELEN DURCH ELEKTROSTATISCHE POTENTIALE | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 05.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.10.2005 | AT | 17.04.2013 | BE | 17.04.2013 | CY | 17.04.2013 | CZ | 17.04.2013 | DK | 17.04.2013 | EE | 17.04.2013 | FI | 17.04.2013 | LT | 17.04.2013 | LV | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | PL | 17.04.2013 | RO | 17.04.2013 | SE | 17.04.2013 | SI | 17.04.2013 | SK | 17.04.2013 | TR | 17.04.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.07.2013 | ES | 28.07.2013 | IS | 17.08.2013 | PT | 19.08.2013 | IE | 07.10.2013 | LU | 07.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
TR | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
IE | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
IE | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 17.04.2013 | |
PT | 19.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5876742 (COCHRUM KENT C [US], et al); | [X]US6033888 (BATICH CHRIS [US], et al) | Examination | WO02081662 |