EP1828276 - INTRINSICALLY VISCOUS HARDENABLE MIXTURES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Coatings GmbH Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | [2010/16] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMGART, Hubert Am Dornbusch 44A 48163 Münster / DE | 02 /
AUSTRUP, Berthold Schmandpott 4 59394 Nordkirchen / DE | 03 /
OTT, Günther von Holte Str. 101 A 48167 Münster / DE | 04 /
JOOST, Karl-Heinz Dartmanns Kamp 7 48317 Drensteinfurt / DE | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Steffan & Kiehne Patentanwälte PartG mbB Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte, Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05817210.7 | 08.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005EP56687 | Priority number, date | DE20041060966 | 17.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004060966 | [2007/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006063976 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1828276 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/67, C08G18/81, C09D175/16 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
C08G18/8116 (EP,US);
C08G18/673 (EP,US);
C09D175/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRUKTURVISKOSE HÄRTBARE GEMISCHE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2007/36] | English: | INTRINSICALLY VISCOUS HARDENABLE MIXTURES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE OF THE SAME | [2007/36] | French: | MELANGES DURCISSABLES A VISCOSITE INTRINSEQUE, PROCEDE POUR LES PRODUIRE ET UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 02.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/01] | 07.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]DE19860041 (BASF AG [DE]) [DX] 1-22 * Polyisocyanato-acrylat 10 auf Seite 8 sowie Tabelle 1 * * claim 17 *; | [X]DE19919826 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-22 * example 3 *; | [PX]EP1541609 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]) [PX] 1-22 * example 27 * |