EP1828992 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING IMAGES USING AUTOMATIC GEOREFERENCING OF IMAGES DERIVED FROM A PAIR OF IMAGES CAPTURED IN THE SAME FOCAL PLANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL D'ETUDES SPATIALES 2 Place Maurice Quentin F-75001 Paris / FR | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VADON, Hélène 37 chemin du coin de la moure F-31500 TOULOUSE / FR | 02 /
LATRY, Christophe 36 avenue Aristide Briand Immeuble B F-31400 TOULOUSE / FR | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Callon de Lamarck, Jean-Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20 Rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | Callon de Lamarck, Jean-Robert, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05817406.1 | 16.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005EP56852 | Priority number, date | FR20040013420 | 16.12.2004 Original published format: FR 0413420 | [2007/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006064051 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1828992 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1828992 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06T17/05 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
G06T17/05 (EP,US);
G01C11/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/36] | G06T17/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERARBEITEN VON BILDERN UNTER VERWENDUNG AUTOMATISCHER GEOREFERENZIERUNG VON BILDERN, DIE AUS ZWEI IN DERSELBEN FOKALEBENE ERFASSTEN BILDERN ABGELEITET WERDEN | [2007/36] | English: | METHOD FOR PROCESSING IMAGES USING AUTOMATIC GEOREFERENCING OF IMAGES DERIVED FROM A PAIR OF IMAGES CAPTURED IN THE SAME FOCAL PLANE | [2007/36] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES METTANT EN OEUVRE LE GEOREFERENCEMENT AUTOMATIQUE D'IMAGES ISSUES D'UN COUPLE D'IMAGES PRIS DANS LE MEME PLAN FOCAL | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 13.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.03.2011 | CY | 02.03.2011 | CZ | 02.03.2011 | DK | 02.03.2011 | EE | 02.03.2011 | FI | 02.03.2011 | HU | 02.03.2011 | IE | 02.03.2011 | LT | 02.03.2011 | LV | 02.03.2011 | NL | 02.03.2011 | PL | 02.03.2011 | RO | 02.03.2011 | SE | 02.03.2011 | SI | 02.03.2011 | SK | 02.03.2011 | TR | 02.03.2011 | BG | 02.06.2011 | GR | 03.06.2011 | ES | 13.06.2011 | IS | 02.07.2011 | PT | 04.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
TR | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 02.03.2011 | |
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6757445 (KNOPP DAVID E [US]) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * column 1, line 35 - column 3, line 45 ** figure 1 *; | [A] - EHLERS M., WELCH R., "Stereocorrelation of Landsat TM Images", PHOTOGRAMMETRIC ENGINEERING AND REMOTE SENSING, (198709), vol. 53, no. 9, pages 1231 - 1237, XP009051483 [A] 1-23 * abstract * * page 1231 - page 1233 * | [A] - IIKURA Y., "Automation of precise ortho-rectification of Landsat TM images", SICE 2002. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 41ST SICE ANNUAL CONFERENCE, (20020805), vol. 3, pages 1898 - 1900, XP002338445 [A] 1-23 * abstract * * séctions 1. et 2. * |