EP1831351 - PRODUCTION FROM BLOOD OF CELLS OF NEURAL LINEAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kwalata Trading Limited PO. Box 22454 1522 Nicosia / CY | [2008/36] |
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states In Motion Investment, Ltd. Basement, Kwong Loong Tai Building 1016-8 Tai Nam West Street Laichikok, Kowloon / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FULGA, Valentin 7 Helsinki Street 62996 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
PORAT, Yael 47 Herzl Street 45283 Hod Hasharon / IL | 03 /
POROZOV, Svetlana 4 Bar-Shaul Street 76251 Rehovot / IL | [2011/30] |
Former [2007/37] | 01 /
FULGA, Valentin 7 Helsinki Street 62996 Tel Aviv / IL | ||
02 /
PORAT, Yael 47 Herzl Street 45283 Hod Hasharon / IL | |||
03 /
POROZOV, Svetlana 4 Bar-Shaul Street 76251 Rehovot / IL | |||
04 /
FISHER, Yehudit 10/28 Zecharia HaTuka Street Rehovot / IL | Representative(s) | Spencer, Matthew Peter Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Spencer, Matthew Peter Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05817653.8 | 14.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005IL01348 | Priority number, date | US20040636391P | 14.12.2004 Original published format: US 636391 P | US20050668739P | 05.04.2005 Original published format: US 668739 P | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006064504 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1831351 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1831351 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/077, C12N5/0797, C12N5/0786, C12N5/0789, C12N5/10, C12N5/16 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
C12N5/0647 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
C12N5/0623 (EP);
C12N5/0645 (EP,US);
C12N5/0657 (EP);
C12N2500/90 (EP);
C12N2501/11 (EP);
C12N2501/115 (EP);
C12N2501/13 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2007/37] | C12N5/00, C12N5/02, C12N5/06, C12N5/10, C12N5/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON NEURALLINIENZELLEN AUS BLUT | [2007/37] | English: | PRODUCTION FROM BLOOD OF CELLS OF NEURAL LINEAGE | [2007/37] | French: | PRODUCTION DE CELLULES DE LIGNEE NEURONALE A PARTIR DU SANG | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 03.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10190450.6 / EP2292733 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   10.06.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.08.2011 | BE | 24.08.2011 | CY | 24.08.2011 | CZ | 24.08.2011 | DK | 24.08.2011 | EE | 24.08.2011 | FI | 24.08.2011 | HU | 24.08.2011 | IT | 24.08.2011 | LT | 24.08.2011 | LV | 24.08.2011 | PL | 24.08.2011 | RO | 24.08.2011 | SE | 24.08.2011 | SI | 24.08.2011 | SK | 24.08.2011 | TR | 24.08.2011 | BG | 24.11.2011 | GR | 25.11.2011 | ES | 05.12.2011 | IS | 24.12.2011 | PT | 26.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 24.08.2011 | |
IS | 24.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03055989 (MOUNT SINAI HOSPITAL CORP [CA], et al); | [X]WO03078610 (MILTENYI BIOTEC GMBH [DE], et al); | International search | [A]US2002151056 (SASAI YOSHIKI [JP], et al) |