EP1819769 - STARCH ACETATE COMPOSITES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE IN PAPER AND BOARD PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M-Real Oyj Revontulentie 6 02100 Espoo / FI | [2007/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILENIUS, Petri Raitapurontie 57 FI-08500 Lohja As. / FI | 02 /
KOIVUNEN, Kimmo Lansantie 23 a A 13 FI-02630 Espoo / FI | 03 /
GÄDDA, Lars Ersintie 7 C 9 FI-02750 Espoo / FI | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Hakkila, Maini Annika, et al Forssén & Salomaa Oy Lautatarhankatu 8 B 00580 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | Hakkila, Maini Annika, et al Forssén & Salomaa Oy Lautatarhankatu 8 B 00580 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 05817784.1 | 05.12.2005 | [2007/34] | WO2005FI50447 | Priority number, date | FI20040001581 | 08.12.2004 Original published format: FI 20041581 | [2007/34] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006061460 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1819769 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08L3/06, C08J3/21, D21H17/00, D21H19/00 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
C08J3/21 (EP);
C08L3/06 (EP);
C08J2303/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STÄRKEACETATVERBUNDMATERIALIEN, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHERN DAFÜR UND VERWENDUNG BEI DER PAPIER- UND PAPPEHERSTELLUNG | [2007/34] | English: | STARCH ACETATE COMPOSITES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE IN PAPER AND BOARD PRODUCTION | [2007/34] | French: | COMPOSITES D'ACETATE D'AMIDON, PROCEDE D'OBTENTION, FABRICATION ET UTILISATION DANS LE SECTEUR DE LA FABRICATION DE PAPIER ET DE CARTON | [2007/34] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2005 | Translation filed | 29.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 31.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 20.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5667803 (PARONEN ET AL) [X] 1 * column 10, line 43 - line 45; example 4 *; | [A]WO9319247 (E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY) [A] 1-16 * page 4, line 14 - line 23 * * page 7, line 3 - line 9 * * page 8, line 30 - line 35 * * page 9, line 18 - line 23 * * page 27, line 33 - page 35, line 35; examples 13-16 * * figure -; claim - *; | [DA]WO9916972 (NATIONAL SILICATES LTD; LE FEVRE, GERARD; DIDWANIA, HANUMAN, PRASAD; H) [DA] 1-16 * page 8, paragraphs 2,3 * * claim 15 *; | [A]CN1098343C ; | CN1314457 [ ] (NORTHWEST-CHINA POLYTECHNIC UNIV.); | [A]WO0192422 (J.M. HUBER CORPORATION); | [DA]US6623555 (HAVERINEN JUKKA P ET AL) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 32, Database accession no. 2002-083731, XP002377001 & CN1098343C C 20030108 (UNIV NORTHWEST CHINA POLYTECHNIC) [A] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 137:96111, URL: STN [ ] * column A * * column A * * column A * |