EP1819821 - Storage-induced promoter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/34] | STORAGE-INDUCED PROMOTER | ||
[2013/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
KWS Saat AG Grimsehlstrasse 31 37555 Einbeck / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CY
CZ
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LT
LU
LV
MC
PL
PT
RO
SI
SK
TR
SÜDZUCKER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Maximilianstrasse 10 68165 Mannheim / DE | [2014/15] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states KWS Saat AG Grimsehlstrasse 31 37555 Einbeck / DE | ||
For all designated states SÜDZUCKER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Maximilianstrasse 10 68165 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEHL, Reinhard Schubertstrasse 1 38114 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
ROTTHUES, Alexander Königsteiner Str. 216 65812 Bad Soden am Taunus / DE | 03 /
STAHL, Dietmar, Jürgen Fasanengrund 1 37574 Einbeck / DE | [2007/41] |
Former [2007/34] | 01 /
HEHL, Reinhard Schubertstrasse 1 38114 Braunschweig / DE | ||
02 /
ROTTHUES, Alexander Rudolfstrasse 6 38114 Braunschweig / DE | |||
03 /
STAHL, Dietmar, Jürgen Fasanengrund 1 37574 Einbeck / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2014/03] |
Former [2014/02] | Pohl, Manfred Pohl & Partner Patentanwälte Kirchenhang 32b 21073 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2010/02] | Pohl, Manfred Pohl & Partner Patentanwälte Kirchenhang 32b 21073 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/34] | Pohl, Manfred Pohl & Partner Patentanwälte Kirchenhang 32 b 21073 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05817889.8 | 23.11.2005 | [2007/34] | WO2005DE02093 | Priority number, date | DE20041057291 | 26.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004057291 | [2007/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006056176 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1819821 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1819821 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, A01H5/00 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
C12N15/8222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/01] |
Former [2007/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lagerungsinduzierter Promotor | [2013/22] | English: | Storage-induced promoter | [2013/22] | French: | Promoteur induit au stockage | [2013/22] |
Former [2007/34] | LAGERUNGSINDUZIERTER PROMOTOR | ||
Former [2007/34] | STORAGE-INDUCED PROMOTER | ||
Former [2007/34] | PROMOTEUR INDUIT AU STOCKAGE | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 11.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.10.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 15.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 04.12.2008 | Appeal received No. T0521/09 | 11.02.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.03.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 29.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.04.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP10012269.6 / EP2333077 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2005 | BG | 08.01.2014 | CY | 08.01.2014 | CZ | 08.01.2014 | EE | 08.01.2014 | ES | 08.01.2014 | FI | 08.01.2014 | IT | 08.01.2014 | LT | 08.01.2014 | LV | 08.01.2014 | MC | 08.01.2014 | RO | 08.01.2014 | SI | 08.01.2014 | SK | 08.01.2014 | TR | 08.01.2014 | GR | 09.04.2014 | IS | 08.05.2014 | PT | 08.05.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/29] | BG | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 08.01.2014 | |
IS | 08.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0812917 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-11 * tables 2,8 * * SEQ ID NO: 1 *; | [A]WO0240687 (KWS SAAT AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0031251 (UNIV OTAGO [NZ], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004049803 (KELLOGG JILL A [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X] - TRINDADE LUISA M ET AL, "Analysis of genes differentially expressed during potato tuber life cycle and isolation of their promoter regions.", PLANT SCIENCE (OXFORD), (200402), vol. 166, no. 2, ISSN 0168-9452, pages 423 - 433, XP007900227 [X] 1,2,4-8 * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.plantsci.2003.10.016 | [ ] - "Solanum tuberosum L362 gene, complete sequence.", EMBL, (20040327), Database accession no. AY356314, URL: EBI, XP002371885 [ ] * the whole document * | [ ] - "Solanum tuberosum L363 gene, complete sequence.", EMBL, (20040327), Database accession no. AY356315, URL: EBI, XP002371884 [ ] * the whole document * | [A] - HASELKAS C ET AL, "The expression of a peroxiredoxin antioxidant gene, AtPer1, in Arabidopsis thaliana is seed-specific and related to dormancy", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, SPRINGER, DORDRECHT, NL, (199804), vol. 36, no. 6, ISSN 0167-4412, pages 833 - 845, XP002300796 [A] 1-11 * figures 1,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1005900832440 | Examination | US2004123343 | by applicant | EP0812917 | WO0240687 | - TRINIDADE ET AL., "Analysis of genes differentially expressed during potato tuber life cycle and isolation of their promoter regions", PLANT SCIENCE, (200402), vol. 166, no. 2, pages 423 - 433 |