EP1824797 - CALIBRATION BODY, CALIBER OR MEASURING DEVICE, PREFERABLY SCREW THREAD GAUGE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SGL Carbon AG Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 18 86405 Meitingen / DE | [2007/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHTER, Norbert Heinrich-von-Buz-Strasse 14 86153 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
BAUMANN, Stefan Untere Osterfeldstrasse 53 86156 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
BENITSCH, Bodo Nachtweide 25 86647 Buttenwiesen / DE | 04 /
SCHMID, Thomas Michael-Maier-Strasse 10 86672 Thierhaupten / DE | 05 /
FENDT, Franz Am Mieselhart 11 86462 Langweid / DE | [2007/35] | Application number, filing date | 05818024.1 | 09.12.2005 | [2007/35] | WO2005EP13248 | Priority number, date | DE20041061438 | 17.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004061438 | [2007/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006066743 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1824797 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1824797 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/573, G01B1/00 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
C04B35/83 (EP,US);
C04B35/522 (EP,US);
C04B35/573 (EP,US);
C04B35/62209 (EP,US);
G01B1/00 (EP,US);
G01B3/38 (EP,US);
C04B2235/422 (EP,US);
C04B2235/428 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
C04B2235/80 (EP,US);
C04B2235/96 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9607 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49007 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KALIBRIERKÖRPER, LEHRE ODER MESSEINRICHTUNG, VORZUGSWEISE GEWINDEMESSEINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN | [2007/35] | English: | CALIBRATION BODY, CALIBER OR MEASURING DEVICE, PREFERABLY SCREW THREAD GAUGE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2007/35] | French: | CORPS DE CALIBRAGE, GABARIT OU DISPOSITIF DE MESURE, DE PREFERENCE INSTRUMENT DE MESURE DE FILETAGE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2007/43] |
Former [2007/35] | CORPS DE CALIBRAGE, GABARIT OU DISPOSITIF DE MESURE, DE PREFERENCE, INSTRUMENT DE MESURE DE FILETAGE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 16.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.03.2008 | CZ | 26.03.2008 | DK | 26.03.2008 | EE | 26.03.2008 | FI | 26.03.2008 | IE | 26.03.2008 | LT | 26.03.2008 | LV | 26.03.2008 | PL | 26.03.2008 | RO | 26.03.2008 | SI | 26.03.2008 | SK | 26.03.2008 | TR | 26.03.2008 | BG | 26.06.2008 | SE | 26.06.2008 | GR | 27.06.2008 | IS | 26.07.2008 | PT | 01.09.2008 | HU | 27.09.2008 | LU | 09.12.2008 | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/40] | CY | 26.03.2008 | |
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
LT | 26.03.2008 | ||
LV | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
TR | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
HU | 27.09.2008 | ||
LU | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 26.03.2008 | |
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
LT | 26.03.2008 | ||
LV | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
LU | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CY | 26.03.2008 | |
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
LT | 26.03.2008 | ||
LV | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
LT | 26.03.2008 | ||
LV | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
LT | 26.03.2008 | ||
LV | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
LT | 26.03.2008 | ||
LV | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
LV | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
LV | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
LV | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | FI | 26.03.2008 | |
LV | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 26.03.2008 | |
LV | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | FI | 26.03.2008 | |
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 26.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19710105 (SGL TECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [DX]DE10003176 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [DX] 1,3,4,6,10-12 * Seite 3, Zeilen 1-11; Seite 4, Zeilen 48-62;; claims 1,10 *; | [XY]US2004097360 (BENITSCH BODO [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,8 * paragraphs [0009] , [0022] , [0023] , [0028]; claims 1,5,16,20; table 1 * [Y] 5,13,15; | [YA]EP1464634 (SGL CARBON AG [DE]) [Y] 5,13,15 * the whole document * [A] 1-12 |