EP1810257 - MOBILE FLOOR CLEANER DATA COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TENNANT COMPANY 701 North Lilac Drive 29 Minneapolis, Minnesota 55440 / US | [2007/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIELD, Bruce, F. 501 Theodore Wirth Parkway Golden Valley, MN 55422 / US | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2007/30] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05818095.1 | 10.11.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005US40565 | Priority number, date | US20040627751P | 12.11.2004 Original published format: US 627751 P | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006053028 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1810257 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1810257 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G08B1/08, G08B21/00, A47L1/08, A47L5/00, A47L11/00, G01C22/00, G05D1/00 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
A47L11/4011 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/08] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DATENKOMMUNIKATION IN MOBILEN BODENREINIGUNGSGERÄTEN | [2007/30] | English: | MOBILE FLOOR CLEANER DATA COMMUNICATION | [2007/30] | French: | COMMUNICATION DE DONNEES A PARTIR D'UN APPAREIL A RECURER LES PARQUETS | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 09.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004083570 (SONG JEONG-GON [KR], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0068] *; | [I]US5959423 (NAKANISHI HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-20 * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 34 *; | [I]JP2002045324 (NIITAKA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO L) [I] 1,12,19 * abstract * | International search | [X]US5995884 (ALLEN TIMOTHY P [US], et al) | by applicant | US5995884 | US2004083570 | US5959423 |