EP1826880 - HETEROSTRUCTURE, INJECTOR LASER, SEMICONDUCTOR AMPLIFYING ELEMENT AND A SEMICONDUCTOR OPTICAL AMPLIFIER A FINAL STAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Nano Optics Limited Centennial Building, 3rd Floor Flat/office 303 Themistokli Dervi, 48 P.C. 1066 Nicosia / CY | [2007/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHVEYKIN, Vasily Ivanovich ul. Arkhitektora Vlasova, 33-1-11 Moscow, 117393 / RU | [2007/35] | Representative(s) | Anohins, Vladimirs Agency Tria Robit P.O. Box 22 Riga 1010 / LV | [N/P] |
Former [2007/35] | Anohins, Vladimirs Agency Tria Robit P.O. Box 22 Riga 1010 / LV | Application number, filing date | 05818165.2 | 15.11.2005 | [2007/35] | WO2005RU00566 | Priority number, date | RU20040133420 | 17.11.2004 Original published format: RU 2004133420 | [2007/35] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006054920 | Date: | 26.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1826880 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 26.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/20, H01S5/323, H01S5/40, H01S5/50, H01S5/028 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
H01S5/50 (EP,US);
H01S5/34 (KR);
H01S5/32 (KR);
H01S5/4006 (EP,US);
H01S5/02251 (EP,US);
H01S5/028 (EP,US);
H01S5/2027 (EP,US);
H01S5/305 (EP,US);
H01S5/3054 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/35] | H01S5/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HETEROSTRUKTUR, INJEKTIONSLASER, HALBLEITER-VERSTÄRKUNGSELEMENT UND OPTISCHER HALBLEITERVERSTÄRKER - EINE ENDSTUFE | [2007/35] | English: | HETEROSTRUCTURE, INJECTOR LASER, SEMICONDUCTOR AMPLIFYING ELEMENT AND A SEMICONDUCTOR OPTICAL AMPLIFIER A FINAL STAGE | [2007/35] | French: | HETEROSTRUCTURE, LASER A INJECTION, ELEMENT AMPLIFICATEUR SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET AMPLIFICATEUR OPTIQUE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2007/35] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2007 | Translation filed | 31.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU | 04.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 17.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/44] | 25.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]RU2197047 (SHVEJKIN VASILIJ IVANOVICH) [Y] 11-18* abstract *; | [X] - H. C. CASEY JR. ET AL., "GaAs-AlxGa1 - xAs HETEROSTRUCTURE LASER WITH SEPARATE OPTICAL AND CARRIER CONFINEMENT.", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19740101), vol. 45, no. 1, pages 322 - 333, XP002590301 [X] 1,4,5,9 * page 322 - page 325; figure 3 * | [T] - BATOP Electronics, "Refractive index n of AlxGa1-xAs alloys", (20090101), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www.batop.de/information/n_AlGaAs.html, (20100705), XP002590302 [T] 1,2 * the whole document * | [IY] - LEDENTSOV N N ET AL, "Novel approaches to semiconductor lasers", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING (SPIE), SPIE, USA LNKD- DOI:10.1117/12.481006, (20020101), vol. 4905, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 222 - 234, XP002274009 [I] 1-10 * page 224 - page 230; figures 3,4,7 * [Y] 11-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.481006 | International search | [A]US4063189 (SCIFRES DONALD R, et al); | [A]EP0794601 (AT & T CORP [US]); | [A]RU2197049 (SHVEJKIN VASILIJ IVANOVICH); | [A]RU2197047 (SHVEJKIN VASILIJ IVANOVICH) | by applicant | US4063189 | RU2142665 | RU2197049 | RU2197048 | RU2197047 | - LASER FOCUS WORLD, (200109), pages 73 - 79 | - IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (199909), vol. 11, no. 9, pages 1099 - 1101 | - P.G. ELISEEV; YU.M. POPOV, KVANTOVAYA ELEKTRONIKA, (1997), vol. 24, no. 12, pages 1067 - 1079 |