EP1829029 - LABELING METHODS AND APPARATUS USING ENERGY OF TWO WAVELENGTHS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. Intellectual Property Administration, 20555 SH 249 Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN BROCKLIN, Andrew L. 3404 E Harmony Rd. Fort Collins, Colorado 80528-9599 / US | 02 /
LIPINSKI, Gregory J. 3404 E Harmony Rd. Fort Collins, Colorado 80528-9599 / US | 03 /
BOERGER, Paul A. 3404 E Harmony Rd. Fort Collins, Colorado 80528-9599 / US | 04 /
HANKS, D. Mitchel c/o Hewlett-Packard Company 3404 E. Harmony Road Fort Collins, CO 80528-9599 / US | [2007/46] |
Former [2007/36] | 01 /
VAN BROCKLIN, Andrew L. 3404 E Harmony Rd. Fort Collins, Colorado 80528-9599 / US | ||
02 /
LIPINSKI, Gregory J. 3404 E Harmony Rd. Fort Collins, Colorado 80528-9599 / US | |||
03 /
BOERGER, Paul A. 3404 E Harmony Rd. Fort Collins, Colorado 80528-9599 / US | |||
04 /
HANKS, D. Mitchel 1000 NE Circle Blvd. Corvallis, Oregon 97330-4239 / US | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05818493.8 | 25.10.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US38584 | Priority number, date | US20040001338 | 30.11.2004 Original published format: US 1338 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006060087 | Date: | 08.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1829029 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1829029 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/0037, G11B23/40 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
G11B7/1267 (EP,US);
G11B23/40 (EP,US);
G11B7/0037 (EP,US);
G11B7/1275 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2007/41] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ETIKETTIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNGEN MIT ENERGIE ZWEIER WELLENLÄNGEN | [2007/36] | English: | LABELING METHODS AND APPARATUS USING ENERGY OF TWO WAVELENGTHS | [2007/36] | French: | PROCEDES ET APPAREIL DE MARQUAGE UTILISANT DES ENERGIES DE DEUX FREQUENCES DIFFERENTES | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 15.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4538257 (KLINGER LANCE T [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0589670 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,8-10 * the whole document * [A] 4-7; | [X]US6424608 (TAKEUCHI RYOJI [JP]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003193864 (PATE MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document * |