EP1828608 - COMPACT ECCENTRIC SCREW PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NETZSCH Pumpen & Systeme GmbH Gebrüder-Netzsch-Strasse 19 95100 Selb / DE | [2013/16] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Netzsch-Mohnopumpen GmbH Gebrüder-Netzsch-Strasse 19 95100 Selb / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Helmuth Josef Hadeir Strasse 16 84359 Simbach am Inn / DE | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05818999.4 | 14.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005DE02303 | Priority number, date | DE20041060222 | 15.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004060222 | [2007/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006063583 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1828608 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F04C2/107, F04C15/00 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
F04C15/0038 (EP,US);
F04C2/107 (KR);
F04C15/00 (KR);
F04C15/0042 (EP,US);
F04C2/1071 (EP,US);
F04C2270/044 (EP,US);
F16B2200/30 (EP,US);
Y10T403/57 (EP,US);
Y10T403/5786 (EP,US);
Y10T403/61 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXZENTERSCHNECKENPUMPE IN KOMPAKTBAUWEISE | [2007/36] | English: | COMPACT ECCENTRIC SCREW PUMP | [2007/36] | French: | POMPE A VIS SANS FIN EXCENTRIQUE DE CONCEPTION COMPACTE | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 03.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/24] | 07.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE2057860 (SEIDL WILHELM DIPL ING) [AD] 1-39 * page 4 - page 6; figure 1 *; | [A]US2002192093 (GANTENHAMMER VINZENZ [DE]) [A] 1-39 * abstract *; | [A]US6358027 (LANE WILLIAM [US]) [A] 1-39 * column 10, line 56 - column 11, line 33; figures 31,32,38,39; claims 1,4,5 * * column 13, line 9 - line 56 * |