EP1827783 - Method and apparatus to prepare a composition for a composite solid surface article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/36] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING COMPOSITE SOLID SURFACE ARTICLE AND COMPOSITE SOLID SURFACE ARTICLE CONTAINING LARGE PARTICLES | ||
[2011/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.02.2013 [2013/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEIL INDUSTRIES INC. 290 Gongdan-dong Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 730-710 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Cheil Industries Inc. 290 Gongdan-dong Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 730-710 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RHA, Do Choon 202 Bongcheon-7dong 1623-4 Gwanak-gu Seoul, 151-848 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Tae Hoon Cheil Indus. Co. House 11-403 Singi-dong 120-140 Yeosu-si, Jeollanam-do, 555-804 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Mi Gon Cheil Indus. Co. House 10-305 Singi-dong 90 Yeosu-si, Jeollanam-do, 555-803 / KR | 04 /
JUNG, Gwang Ho Ajutown 103-1203 Bonggye-dong 16 Yeosu-si, Jeollanam-do, 555-751 / KR | [2012/09] |
Former [2007/36] | 01 /
RHA, Do Choon 202 Bongcheon-7dong 1623-4, Gwanak-gu Seoul, 151-848 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Tae Hoon Cheil Indus. Co. House 11-403 Singi-dong 120-140 Yeosu-si, Jeollanam-do, 555-804 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Mi Gon Cheil Indus. Co. House 10-305 Singi-dong 90 Yeosu-si, Jeollanam-do, 555-803 / KR | |||
04 /
JUNG, Gwang Ho Ajutown 103-1203, Bonggye-dong 16 Yeosu-si, Jeollanam-do, 555-751 / KR | Representative(s) | Bublak, Wolfgang Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Bublak, Wolfgang Bardehle Pagenberg Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Bublak, Wolfgang Bardehle, Pagenberg, Dost, Altenburg, Geissler, Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Bublak, Wolfgang Bardehle, Pagenberg, Dost, Altenburg, Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05819112.3 | 08.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005KR04200 | Priority number, date | KR20040102843 | 08.12.2004 Original published format: KR 20040102843 | [2011/39] |
Former [2007/36] | KR2010200040102 | 08.12.2004 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006062363 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1827783 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1827783 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/24, C04B26/06, B01F3/12, B01F3/14, B01F7/08, B01F15/02, B01F7/00 | [2011/33] | CPC: |
B29C67/243 (EP,KR,US);
B01F27/2123 (EP,KR,US);
B01F23/57 (EP,KR,US);
B01F23/53 (EP,KR,US);
B01F27/724 (EP,KR,US);
B01F35/71775 (EP,KR,US);
C04B26/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/32 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2111/545 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B26/06, C04B14/285, C04B14/303, C04B20/0076 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/36] | B28B5/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/12] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer Mischung für einen Verbundkörper mit einer festen Oberfläche | [2011/33] | English: | Method and apparatus to prepare a composition for a composite solid surface article | [2011/33] | French: | Procédé et appareil de fabrication d'un mélange pour un article composite à surface solide | [2011/33] |
Former [2007/36] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VERBUNDKÖRPERS MIT FESTER OBERFLÄCHE UND GROSSE TEILCHEN ENTHALTENDER VERBUNDKÖRPER MIT FESTER OBERFLÄCHE | ||
Former [2007/36] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING COMPOSITE SOLID SURFACE ARTICLE AND COMPOSITE SOLID SURFACE ARTICLE CONTAINING LARGE PARTICLES | ||
Former [2007/36] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE FABRICATION D'UN ARTICLE COMPOSITE A SURFACE SOLIDE ET ARTICLE COMPOSITE A SURFACE SOLIDE CONTENANT DES PARTICULES DE GRANDE DIMENSION | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 09.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.07.2011 | 14.07.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]FR2003091 (BASF AG) [X] 1,7,8,10-13,15-17 * the whole document * * in particular * * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 6 * * page 2, line 23 - page 2, line 30 * * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 9 * * example 3 * [A] 14,18-29 [Y] 30-35; | [XAY]US4652596 (WILLIAMS ROBERT D [US], et al) [X] 1-7,15-17 * the whole document * * in particular * * column 1, line 5 - column 1, line 16 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 3 * * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 48 * * column 5, line 36 - column 7, line 19; figures 3-8 * [A] 30-35 [Y] 18-29,36,37,39-45; | [XAY]DE3837430 (KONTRINER MANFRED [AT]) [X] 1,7-12,15-17 * the whole document * [A] 14 [Y] 18-37,39-45; | [XA]US2001006991 (VIDAURRE-HEIREMANS VICTOR [CL], et al) [X] 36,37,39-45 * the whole document * * in particular * * paragraphs [0047] , [0048] , [0166] - [0177] - [0186] - [0199] - [0222] - [0242] * * figures 6a,6b,7 * [A] 1-35,38,43; | [AP]WO2005014256 (COSENTINO SA [ES], et al) [AP] 1,8-14,16-26,28-35 * paragraphs [0014] - [0028] ** claims 1-12,25-46 * | International search | [X]JPH07205338 (HIROSHIMA KASEI LTD); | [A]KR960003957 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]JPH09188556 (M R C DU PONT KK); | [X]KR19990039632 ; | [X]JP2001009829 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) | Examination | US6323259 |