EP1815267 - SYMMETRICAL MULTIPATH METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE DISTANCE BETWEEN TWO TRANSCEIVERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | Opposition rejected | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanotron Technologies GmbH Alt-Moabit 60 10555 Berlin / DE | [2015/24] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states Nanotron Technologies GmbH Alt-Moabit 61 10555 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENZER, Lars 1518 Laurent St. Santa Cruz, California 95060 / US | 02 /
IANELLI, Zbigniew Swinemünder Str. 92 13355 Berlin / DE | 03 /
HACH, Rainer Argentinische Allee 14a 14163 Berlin / DE | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/32] | 01 /
MENZER, Lars 1518 Laurent St. Santa Cruz, California 95060 / US | ||
02 /
IANELLI, Zbigniew Swinemünder Str. 92 13355 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
HACH, Rainer Brahestr. 24 10589 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Stralauer Platz 34 10243 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Spreepalais am Dom Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2007/32] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 05819140.4 | 15.11.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005EP55996 | Priority number, date | US20040628494P | 15.11.2004 Original published format: US 628494 P | DE20041055651 | 15.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004055651 | [2007/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006051119 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1815267 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1815267 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/76 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
G01S13/76 (KR);
G01S13/765 (EP,US);
G01S7/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2007/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYMMETRISCHES MEHRWEGVERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES ABSTANDES ZWEIER SENDEREMPFÄNGER | [2007/32] | English: | SYMMETRICAL MULTIPATH METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE DISTANCE BETWEEN TWO TRANSCEIVERS | [2007/32] | French: | PROCEDE SYMETRIQUE A TRAJETS MULTIPLES POUR DETERMINER LA DISTANCE ENTRE DEUX EMETTEURS-RECEPTEURS | [2007/32] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 21.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.10.2014 | 14.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2016
17.03.2016
ADMISSIBLE DECAWAVE LTD. Adelaide Chambers Dublin 8 / IE Opponent's representative Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2016
17.03.2016
ADMISSIBLE DECAWAVE LTD. Adelaide Chambers Dublin 8 / IE Opponent's representative Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | 14.04.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.10.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.01.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.01.2018 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 20.07.2018 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2018/41] | Appeal following opposition | 09.02.2018 | Appeal received No. T0397/18 | 15.05.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.07.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.11.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 08.11.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.11.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.09.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 17.09.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.10.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2005 | CY | 10.06.2015 | CZ | 10.06.2015 | DK | 10.06.2015 | EE | 10.06.2015 | ES | 10.06.2015 | FI | 10.06.2015 | IT | 10.06.2015 | LT | 10.06.2015 | LV | 10.06.2015 | MC | 10.06.2015 | NL | 10.06.2015 | PL | 10.06.2015 | RO | 10.06.2015 | SE | 10.06.2015 | SI | 10.06.2015 | SK | 10.06.2015 | TR | 10.06.2015 | BG | 10.09.2015 | GR | 11.09.2015 | IS | 10.10.2015 | PT | 12.10.2015 | AT | 15.11.2015 | LU | 15.11.2015 | BE | 30.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/19] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
AT | 15.11.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 10.06.2015 | |
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6483454 (TORRE FRANK M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-44,46-64,66-68 * abstract * * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 15 * * column 4, line 30 - column 11, line 58 *; | [A]DE10161507 (AUSTRIAMICROSYSTEMS AG [AT]) [A] 1-68 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0148] * * paragraph [0154] *; | [A]WO03077432 (XTREMESPECTRUM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-68 * page 8, line 19 - page 9, line 17 * * page 15, line 15 - page 20, line 20 *; | [A]US5959568 (WOOLLEY LOUIS A [US]) [A] 1-68 * column 6, line 35 - column 11, line 42 * | Examination | US2001053174 | WO03036833 | by applicant | US2001053174 | Opposition | US2001053174 | US2004203931 | US2002118723 | US2004203877 | US2001022558 | US4357609 | US6133876 | US6483454 | GB2366490 | WO9810538 | DE10238887 | - Carill Sharpe, Kempe's Engineer's Year-Book, Miller Freeman, (19960000), pages 625-629,1739 - 1744, XP055359066 |