EP1827167 - REPLACEABLE ACCESSORY FOR A SMALL-SCALE ELECTRICAL UNIT, AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE PERIOD OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEYER, Christian Schillerstr.9 65760 Eschborn / DE | [2007/44] |
Former [2007/36] | 01 /
NEYER, Christian Steinbacher Strasse 2 65760 Eschborn / DE | Application number, filing date | 05819404.4 | 16.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005EP13559 | Priority number, date | DE20041062150 | 23.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004062150 | [2007/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006069644 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1827167 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1827167 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A46B15/00 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
A61C17/221 (EP,US);
A46B15/0002 (EP,US);
A46B15/001 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSWECHSELBARES ZUBEHÖRTEIL FÜR EIN ELEKTROKLEINGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN DER BENUTZUNGSDAUER DES ZUBEHÖRTEILS | [2007/36] | English: | REPLACEABLE ACCESSORY FOR A SMALL-SCALE ELECTRICAL UNIT, AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE PERIOD OF USE THEREOF | [2007/36] | French: | ACCESSOIRE INTERCHANGEABLE POUR PETIT APPAREIL ELECTRIQUE, ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LA DUREE D'UTILISATION DE CET ACCESSOIRE | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 07.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.05.2011 | CZ | 04.05.2011 | EE | 04.05.2011 | FI | 04.05.2011 | HU | 04.05.2011 | IE | 04.05.2011 | LT | 04.05.2011 | LV | 04.05.2011 | PL | 04.05.2011 | RO | 04.05.2011 | SI | 04.05.2011 | SK | 04.05.2011 | TR | 04.05.2011 | BG | 04.08.2011 | GR | 05.08.2011 | IS | 04.09.2011 | PT | 05.09.2011 | LU | 16.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
TR | 04.05.2011 | ||
BG | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
LU | 16.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
BG | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
LU | 16.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
LU | 16.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 04.05.2011 | |
PT | 05.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4698869 (MIERAU HANS-DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0634151 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19506129 (GIMELLI & CO AG [CH]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5930858 (JUNG PHILIPP [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE29915858U (GERHARDS MATTHIAS [DE]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US6029303 (DEWAN RAMAN N [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US6081957 (WEBB HERBERT L [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10026513 (KOESE ZEKI [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002088068 (LEVY DAVID H [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AX]DE10247698 (THOMAS RALPH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * [X] 7-10; | [X]US2004134000 (HILFINGER PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO03054771 | DE10247698 |