EP1855322 - CRYSTALLINE SILICON WAFER, CRYSTALLINE SILICON SOLAR CELL, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CRYSTALLINE SILICON WAFER AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CRYSTALLINE SILICON SOLAR CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTAKE, Yasutoshi 53-6-101, Oeboshi, Toyama-shi Toyama 930-0922 / JP | 02 /
HAGINO, Masato 512-14, Otsuka, Koryo-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara 635-0834 / JP | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05819571.0 | 26.12.2005 | [2007/46] | WO2005JP23793 | Priority number, date | JP20050010319 | 18.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005010319 | [2007/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006077719 | Date: | 27.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1855322 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/04 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
H01L31/02363 (EP,US);
H01L31/035281 (EP,US);
H01L31/03529 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2008/15] |
Former [2007/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRISTALLINER SILIZIUM-WAFER, KRISTALLINE SILIZIUM-SOLARZELLE; VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KRISTALLINEN SILIZIUM-WAFERS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KRISTALLINEN SILIZIUM-SOLARZELLE | [2007/46] | English: | CRYSTALLINE SILICON WAFER, CRYSTALLINE SILICON SOLAR CELL, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CRYSTALLINE SILICON WAFER AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CRYSTALLINE SILICON SOLAR CELL | [2007/46] | French: | PLAQUETTE EN SILICIUM CRISTALLIN, CELLULE SOLAIRE EN SILICIUM CRISTALLIN ET PROCEDES POUR LES FABRIQUER | [2007/46] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2007 | Translation filed | 17.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 21.08.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.05.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH09167850 (PHOTOWATT INT [FR]); | [X]JPH10303443 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [X]JP2000323736 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JP2002293528 (SHARP KK); | [A]JPH11214722 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2003258285 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2004063744 (SHINRYO CORP); | [AP]JP2005217193 (SHINRYO CORP); | [XP]JP2005331060 (SHIMOMURA SEISAKUSHO KK) |