EP1825122 - ENGINE START CONTROL APPARATUS, ENGINE START CONTROL METHOD, AND MOTOR VEHICLE EQUIPPED WITH ENGINE START CONTROL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | |||
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | |||
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Shigenori c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1, Showa-cho, Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | [2008/41] |
Former [2007/35] | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Shigenori DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2007/35] | Kuhnen & Wacker Intellectual Property Law Firm Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 05819575.1 | 19.12.2005 | [2007/35] | WO2005JP23696 | Priority number, date | JP20040365908 | 17.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004365908 | JP20050177472 | 17.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005177472 | [2007/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006064980 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1825122 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1825122 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1825122 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/06, F02D41/34 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
F02D41/065 (EP,US);
F02D41/009 (EP,US);
F02D41/062 (EP,US);
F02D2041/0092 (EP,US);
F02D2041/0095 (EP,US);
F02D2200/1015 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/13] |
Former [2007/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOTORSTARTSTEUERVORRICHTUNG, MOTORSTARTSTEUERVERFAHREN UND MIT DER MOTORSTARTSTEUERVORRICHTUNG AUSGESTATTETES KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2007/35] | English: | ENGINE START CONTROL APPARATUS, ENGINE START CONTROL METHOD, AND MOTOR VEHICLE EQUIPPED WITH ENGINE START CONTROL APPARATUS | [2007/35] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE DEMARRAGE DU MOTEUR, PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE DEMARRAGE DU MOTEUR ET VEHICULE A MOTEUR EQUIPE DUDIT APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE DEMARRAGE DU MOTEUR | [2007/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 14.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6568372 (KANNO ISAO [JP]) [X] 1,4,10,12,17,18 * column 11, line 51 - column 12, line 21 * [Y] 7,8,11; | [PX]EP1577526 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [PX] 1 * paragraphs [0101] - [0104]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1439300 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0048]; figures 1,3 *; | [X]US4989554 (KUSHIDA KAZUMITSU [JP], et al) [X] 7,8,11 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 5 * * column 9, line 3 - line 51 *; | [Y]WO0065217 (TNO [NL], et al) [Y] 7,8,11 * page 11, line 19 - line 30 *; | [A]JPS63208644 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881220), vol. 012, no. 487, Database accession no. (M - 778), & JP63208644 A 19880830 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 7 * abstract * |