EP1837413 - ROLLING-SLIDING ELEMENTS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2007/47] |
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states Aichi Steel Corporation 1, Wanowari, Arao-machi Tokai-shi Aichi-Ken 476-8666 / JP | ||
For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIZAWA, Katsuhikoco AICHI STEEL CORPORATION Wanowari,Arao -machi Tokai-shi, Aichi 476-8666 / JP | 02 /
FUJIWARA, Terumoto 282-9, Nishibojo-cho Yamatotakada-shi, Nara 6350058 / JP | 03 /
NISHIKAWA, Tomoaki c/o Aichi Steel corp. 1, Wanowari, Arao-machi Tokai-shi, Aichi 4768666 / JP | 04 /
MIKAMI, Tsuyoshi c/o Aichi Steel Corp. 1, Wanowari, Arao-machi Tokai-shi, Aichi 4768666 / JP | [2011/36] |
Former [2007/46] | 01 /
KIZAWA, Katsuhikoco AICHI STEEL CORPORATION Wanowari,Arao -machi Tokai-shi, Aichi 476-8666 / JP | ||
02 /
FUJIWARA, Terumoto 282-9, Nishibojo-cho Yamatotakada-shi, Nara 6350058 / JP | |||
03 /
NISHIKAWA, Tomoaki c/o Aichi Steel corp., 1, Wanowari, Arao-machi Tokai-shi, Aichi 4768666 / JP | |||
04 /
MIKAMI, Tsuyoshi c/o Aichi Steel Corp., 1, Wanowari, Arao-machi Tokai-shi, Aichi 4768666 / JP | |||
Former [2007/44] | 01 /
KIZAWA, Katsuhiko 802, 6-10, Tamatsukuri 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-0004 / JP | ||
02 /
FUJIWARA, Terumoto 282-9, Nishibojo-cho Yamatotakada-shi, Nara 6350058 / JP | |||
03 /
NISHIKAWA, Tomoaki c/o Aichi Steel corp., 1, Wanowari, Arao-machi Tokai-shi, Aichi 4768666 / JP | |||
04 /
MIKAMI, Tsuyoshi c/o Aichi Steel Corp., 1, Wanowari, Arao-machi Tokai-shi, Aichi 4768666 / JP | |||
Former [2007/39] | 01 /
KIZAWA, Katsuhiko 13-1, Asahigaoka 2-chome Kashiwara-shi, Osaka 5820026 / JP | ||
02 /
FUJIWARA, Terumoto 282-9, Nishibojo-cho Yamatotakada-shi, Nara 6350058 / JP | |||
03 /
NISHIKAWA, Tomoaki c/o Aichi Steel corp., 1, Wanowari, Arao-machi Tokai-shi, Aichi 4768666 / JP | |||
04 /
MIKAMI, Tsuyoshi c/o Aichi Steel Corp., 1, Wanowari, Arao-machi Tokai-shi, Aichi 4768666 / JP | Representative(s) | Steinmeister, Helmut, et al Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | Steinmeister, Helmut, et al Patentanwälte TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 05819832.6 | 22.12.2005 | [2007/39] | WO2005JP23565 | Priority number, date | JP20040373658 | 24.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004373658 | [2007/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006068205 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1837413 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1837413 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C23C8/22, F16C33/62 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
C23C8/02 (EP);
C23C8/22 (EP,KR);
C21D1/06 (EP);
C21D1/32 (EP);
C21D9/40 (EP);
C22C38/002 (EP);
C22C38/02 (EP);
C22C38/04 (EP);
C22C38/22 (EP);
C22C38/24 (EP);
C23C8/20 (KR);
C23C8/80 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/06] |
Former [2007/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ROLL-GLEIT-ELEMENTE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/39] | English: | ROLLING-SLIDING ELEMENTS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF THE SAME | [2007/39] | French: | ELEMENTS ROULANTS-COULISSANTS ET PROCEDE POUR LES PRODUIRE | [2007/39] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2007 | Translation filed | 11.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 05.09.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.11.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 07.09.2011 | GB | 22.12.2011 | [2012/46] |
Former [2012/23] | IT | 07.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1070760 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0045] , [0079] *; | [A]EP1258644 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0008] , [0021] - [0045]; figures 1-4; tables 1-10 *; | [A]EP1400606 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [A] 1-8* tables 1-3 *; | [X]JP2004285460 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0019] * | International search | [A]JP2002356738 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2004285474 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [A]JPH0972342 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [A]JPH06293939 (KOBE STEEL LTD) | by applicant | JP2004285460 | EP1070760 |