EP1814621 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO RESPIRATORY CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intersurgical AG Landstrasse 11 Vaduz / LI | [2007/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pittaway, Alan 138 Brands Hill Avenue High Wycombe Buckinghamshire HP13 5QP / GB | 02 /
Holder, Michael John 16 Pyrton Lane Watlington Ox fordshire OX9 5LX / GB | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Adamson Jones Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | ||
Former [2007/32] | Cooper, Simon Mark, et al Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG1 1GF / GB | Application number, filing date | 05820457.9 | 24.11.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005GB04777 | Priority number, date | GB20040025782 | 24.11.2004 Original published format: GB 0425782 | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006056807 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1814621 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1814621 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/22, A62B19/00 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
A61M16/22 (EP,US);
A62B19/00 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/09] |
Former [2007/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN VON ATEMWEGSKREISLÄUFEN | [2007/32] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO RESPIRATORY CIRCUITS | [2007/32] | French: | AMELIORATIONS CONCERNANT DES CIRCUITS RESPIRATOIRES | [2007/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 16.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | CY | 31.03.2010 | CZ | 31.03.2010 | DK | 31.03.2010 | EE | 31.03.2010 | FI | 31.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | LT | 31.03.2010 | LV | 31.03.2010 | PL | 31.03.2010 | RO | 31.03.2010 | SE | 31.03.2010 | SI | 31.03.2010 | SK | 31.03.2010 | TR | 31.03.2010 | BG | 30.06.2010 | IS | 31.07.2010 | HU | 01.10.2010 | IE | 24.11.2010 | LU | 24.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/42] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LU | 24.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LU | 24.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LU | 24.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH207614 (VON HOFF ADOLF [DE]); | [X]CH215781 (ECKHARDT VILEM [CZ], et al); | [X]FR881620 ; | [X]DE891052 (DRAEGERWERK AG); | [X]US3752654 (JOHANNISSON D, et al); | [XA]WO03092817 (SEQUAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) |