EP1820379 - COMMUNICATIONS JACK WITH PRINTED WIRING BOARD HAVING SELF-COUPLING CONDUCTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMSCOPE INC. OF NORTH CAROLINA 1100 Commscope Place, SE Hickory North Carolina 28601 / US | [2012/44] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states CommScope, Inc. of North Carolina 1100 Commscope Place, SE Hickory North Carolina 28601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIM, Amid 3900 Sundew Court Plano, Texas 75093 / US | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/34] | Popp, Eugen, et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05820868.7 | 03.11.2005 | [2007/34] | WO2005US39586 | Priority number, date | US20040633783P | 07.12.2004 Original published format: US 633783 P | US20040636590P | 16.12.2004 Original published format: US 636590 P | US20040636595P | 16.12.2004 Original published format: US 636595 P | US20050648002P | 28.01.2005 Original published format: US 648002 P | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006062629 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1820379 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1820379 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/16 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
H01R13/6469 (EP);
H01R13/6477 (EP);
H01R4/2429 (EP);
H05K1/0228 (EP);
H01F17/0006 (EP);
H01R13/6633 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/11] |
Former [2007/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSTECKER MIT LEITERPLATTE MIT SELBSTKOPPELNDEN LEITERN | [2007/34] | English: | COMMUNICATIONS JACK WITH PRINTED WIRING BOARD HAVING SELF-COUPLING CONDUCTORS | [2007/34] | French: | JACK DE COMMUNICATION AVEC CIRCUIT IMPRIME EQUIPE DE CONDUCTEURS A AUTO-INDUCTION | [2007/34] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 26.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5997358 (ADRIAENSSENS LUC W [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,13-20,25-27 * column 6, line 38 - line 58 * * column 7, line 1 - line 5 * * column 8, line 22 - line 33 * * column 10, line 31 - line 37 * * figures 6,7 *; | [Y]US6170154 (SWARUP ARVIND [CA]) [Y] 1-8,13-20,25-27 * column 7, line 35 - line 41 * * column 12, line 22 - line 43 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US6428362 (PHOMMACHANH CHANSY [US]) [A] 1,3-8,13,15-20,25,26 * column 8, line 18 - line 19 *; | [A]US6811442 (LIEN WEN-FU [TW], et al) [A] 1,25,26 * figure 3 * | by applicant | US6350158 | US6196880 | US5975919 | - H. GREENHOUSE, "Design of Planar Rectangular Microelectric Inductors", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PARTS, HYBRIDS, AND PACKAGING, (197406), vol. PHP-10, no. 2, page 103 |