EP1836473 - EVALUATING METHOD OF THE RESIDUAL STRESS DETERMINING METHOD USING THE CONTINUOUS INDENTATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jung, Won Seok 32-9, Hwoiwon 1-dong, Hwoiwon-gu Masan-si, Gyeongsangnam-do 630-040 / KR | For all designated states Frontics, Inc. 3rd Fl. 305 ho, Center for Advanced Materials Research Institute, Seoul National Univ. An 56-1 Sillim-dong Gwanak-gu, Seoul / KR | [2018/42] |
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states Jung, Won Seok 32-9, Hwoiwon 1-dong, Hwoiwon-gu Masan-si, Gyeongsangnam-do 630-040 / KR | ||
For all designated states Frontics, Inc. 3rd Fl. 305 ho, Center for Advanced Materials Research Institute, Seoul National Univ. An 56-1 Sillim-dong, Gwanak-gu; An 56-1 Sillim-dong, Gwanak-gu; / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Kwang Ho B01 Ho 66-21 Bongcheon 6-dong Gwank-gu Seoul, 151-050 / KR | [2018/42] |
Former [2007/39] | 01 /
KIM, Kwang Ho B01 Ho, 66-21 Bongcheon 6-dong, Gwank-gu Seoul, 151-050 / KR | Representative(s) | Schumacher & Willsau Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Nymphenburger Straße 42 80335 München / DE | [2018/42] |
Former [2013/31] | Schumacher & Willsau Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Nymphenburger Strasse 42 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/39] | Schumacher, Dirk Schumacher & Willsau Patentanwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Strasse 42 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05821024.6 | 22.11.2005 | [2007/39] | WO2005KR03947 | Priority number, date | KR20040106759 | 16.12.2004 Original published format: KR 20040106759 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006071001 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1836473 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1836473 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N3/42 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
G01N3/42 (EP,KR,US);
G01N3/48 (KR);
G01N2011/0033 (KR);
G01N2203/0076 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0078 (KR);
G01N2203/008 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2203/0082 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/42] |
Former [2007/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUSWERTUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DAS EIGENSPANNUNGSBESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG DES DAUEREINDRUCKVERFAHRENS | [2007/39] | English: | EVALUATING METHOD OF THE RESIDUAL STRESS DETERMINING METHOD USING THE CONTINUOUS INDENTATION METHOD | [2007/39] | French: | PROCEDE D'EVALUATION POUR LE PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DE LA CONTRAINTE RESIDUELLE A L'AIDE DU PROCEDE DE PENETRATION EN CONTINU | [2007/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 02.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 11.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.11.2005 | AT | 17.10.2018 | CY | 17.10.2018 | CZ | 17.10.2018 | DK | 17.10.2018 | EE | 17.10.2018 | ES | 17.10.2018 | FI | 17.10.2018 | IT | 17.10.2018 | LT | 17.10.2018 | LV | 17.10.2018 | MC | 17.10.2018 | NL | 17.10.2018 | PL | 17.10.2018 | RO | 17.10.2018 | SE | 17.10.2018 | SI | 17.10.2018 | SK | 17.10.2018 | TR | 17.10.2018 | IE | 22.11.2018 | LU | 22.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | BG | 17.01.2019 | GR | 18.01.2019 | IS | 17.02.2019 | PT | 17.02.2019 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 22.11.2005 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 17.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9961883 (INVENTIUM LLC [US]) [Y] 1-14 * page 18, line 3 - line 24; figure 2 * * page 21, line 6 - page 23, line 10 *; | [Y]US2003217591 (KWON DONGIL [KR], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0137]; figure 14 *; | [Y] - YUN-HEE LEE ET AL, "Residual stresses in DLC/Si and Au/Si systems: Application of a stress-relaxation model to the nanoindentation technique", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS RESEARCH, (20020401), vol. 17, no. 04, doi:10.1557/JMR.2002.0131, ISSN 0884-2914, pages 901 - 906, XP055085439 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1557/JMR.2002.0131 | [A] - BHARAT BHUSHAN ET AL, "Nanomechanical characterisation of solid surfaces and thin films", INTERNATIONAL MATERIALS REVIEWS, (20030601), vol. 48, no. 3, doi:10.1179/095066003225010227, ISSN 0950-6608, pages 125 - 164, XP055085459 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1179/095066003225010227 | [A] - YEOL CHOI ET AL, "Analysis of sharp-tip-indentation load-depth curve for contact area determination taking into account pile-up and sink-in effects", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS RESEARCH, (20041101), vol. 19, no. 11, doi:10.1557/JMR.2004.0419, ISSN 0884-2914, pages 3307 - 3315, XP055085449 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1557/JMR.2004.0419 | International search | [A]US6311135 (SURESH SUBRA [US], et al); | [A]US6568250 (SINHA ARVIND K [US]); | [A]US5463896 (ABBATE AGOSTINO [US], et al); | [A]JPH0579928 (HITACHI LTD) | Examination | - JANG J-I ET AL, "Assessing welding residual stress in A335 P12 steel welds before and after stress-relaxation annealing through instrumented indentation technique", SCRIPTA MATERIALIA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030317), vol. 48, no. 6, doi:10.1016/S1359-6462(02)00537-7, ISSN 1359-6462, pages 743 - 748, XP004404059 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6462(02)00537-7 | by applicant | WO9961883 | US2003217591 | KR100416723B | - YEOL CHOI et al., "Analysis of sharp-tip-indentation load-depth curve for contact area determination taking into account pile-up and sink-in effects", Journal of Materials Research, (20041101), vol. 19, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1557/JMR.2004.0419, ISBN 0884-2914, pages 3307 - 3315, XP055085449 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1557/JMR.2004.0419 | - "Assessing welding residual stress in A335 P12 steel welds before and after stress-relaxation annealing through instrumented indentation technique", JANG J-I et al., Scripta Materi-alia, Elsevier, (20030317), vol. 48, pages 743 - 748 | - YUN-HEE LEE et al., "Residual stresses in DLC/Si and Au/Si systems: Application of a stress-relaxation model to the nanoindentation technique", Journal of Materials Research, (20020401), vol. 17, no. 04, doi:doi:10.1557/JMR.2002.0131, ISBN 0884-2914, pages 901 - 906, XP055085439 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1557/JMR.2002.0131 |