EP1836630 - RECODING MEDIUM FOR POINT OF INFORMATION/NEWS INFORMATION SERVICE FRAME STRUCTURE, AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING APPLICATION SERVICE BASED ON TPEG PROTOCOL USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 161, Gajeong-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejon-si 305-350 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states ELECTRONICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH INSTITUTE 161, Gajeong-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejon-si 305-350 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Young-ho 702-903, Yeolmae Maeul Site 7, Jijok-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon 305-770 / KR | 02 /
CHO, Sam-Mo 106-1105 Hanmaeul Apt., Songgang-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-756 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Geon 101-1002 Hansol Apt., Songgang-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-758 / KR | 04 /
AHN, Chung-Hyun 101-705 Hyundai Apt., Doryong-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | 05 /
HAHM, Young-Kwon 133-101 Hanbit Apt., Eoeun-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-755 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Kyu-Heon 201-904 Saemmeori Apt., Dunsan-dong, Seo-gu Daejeon 302-120 / KR | 07 /
LEE, Soo-In 106-606 Clover Apt., Dunsan-dong, Seo-gu Daejeon 302-120 / KR | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05821288.7 | 06.12.2005 | [2007/39] | WO2005KR04139 | Priority number, date | KR20040101833 | 06.12.2004 Original published format: KR 20040101833 | KR20050082083 | 05.09.2005 Original published format: KR 20050082083 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006062324 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1836630 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, G08G1/09 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
H04H20/57 (EP);
G08G1/092 (EP);
H04H20/55 (EP);
H04H60/27 (EP);
H04H20/53 (EP);
H04H60/70 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/39] | G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | DE [2008/01] |
Former [2007/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM FÜR EINE INFORMATIONSPUNKT-/NACHRICHTENIN-FORMATIONSDIENSTRAHMENSTRUKTUR UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANWENDUNGSDIENSTVERARBEITUNG AUF DER BASIS DES TPEG-PROTOKOLLS DAMIT | [2007/39] | English: | RECODING MEDIUM FOR POINT OF INFORMATION/NEWS INFORMATION SERVICE FRAME STRUCTURE, AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING APPLICATION SERVICE BASED ON TPEG PROTOCOL USING THE SAME | [2007/39] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT POUR STRUCTURE DE TRAME DE SERVICE D'INFORMATIONS DE POINT D'INTERET/NOUVELLES, ET APPAREIL DESTINE A TRAITER UN SERVICE D'APPLICATION BASE SUR LE PROTOCOLE TPEG AU MOYEN DE CELUI-CI | [2007/39] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 07.07.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.07.2013 | 19.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/45] | 29.06.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/45] | 11.07.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5627549 (PARK MICHAEL C [US]) [A] 1-7,12-15 * column 3, line 1 - column 10, line 56 *; | [A]US5649300 (SNYDER JEROME F [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6,7* column 3, line 20 - column 11, line 19 *; | [IY]EP1357529 (VEHICLE INFORMATION AND COMM S [JP]) [I] 1,2,5-11,13,16,17 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0258] * [Y] 3,4,12,14,15; | [IA]US2004136408 (TOMOBE OSAMU [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,8,9,13,16 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0086] * [A] 5-7,10-12,17; | [IA] - KOPITZ D ET AL, "TRAFFIC AND TRAVEL INFORMATION BROADCASTING", EBU REVIEW- TECHNICAL, EUROPEAN BROADCASTING UNION. BRUSSELS, BE, (19990321), no. 279, ISSN 0251-0936, pages 4 - 12, XP000848406 [I] 1,2,8,9,11 * the whole document * [A] 7 | [XY] - T. Ferne, "TPEG Library v2.0 overview", (200208), BBC R&D White Paper, URL: http://downloads.bbc.co.uk/rd/projects/tpeg/downloads/tpegLibraryOverview.pdf, (20101119), XP002610438 [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4,12,14,15 | [XA] - THE TPEG FORUM, "End-user friendly location concepts", INTERNET CITATION, (20041026), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20041026043951/www.tpeg.org/pdf/what_is_tp eg/T5_030804DK_D13_map+tool_3gr.pdf, (20051207), XP002357777 [X] 13 * the whole document * [A] 1-7,14,15 | [XA] - WRIGHT D, "The BBC and DAB-TPEG", 19990303, (19990303), pages 11/1 - 11/2, XP006500622 [X] 16 * the whole document * [A] 1,8-11,17 | International search | [Y]KR20040080884 ; | [Y]JPH1089976 ; | [A]US6026375 ; | [A]KR20030092679 ; | [A]JP2002109386 |