EP1831956 - MINIATURE ANTENNA FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A3 - Advanced Automotive Antennas Centro Tecnico "Pujol i Tarrago" Pol. Ind. "Can Magarola" Ctra. C-17, Km. 13 08100 Mollet del Valles / ES | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTINEZ ORTIGOSA, E. Ctr. Tecn. "pujol I Tarrago Pol. Ind. "can Magarola", C-17, Km 13 E-08100 Mollet Del Valles (barcelona) / ES | 02 /
PUENTE BALIARDA, C. Ctr. Tecn. "pujol I Tarrago Pol. Ind. "can Magarola", C-17, Km 13 E-08100 Mollet Del Valles (barcelona) / ES | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 05821464.4 | 08.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005EP13144 | Priority number, date | US20040634804P | 09.12.2004 Original published format: US 634804 P | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006061218 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1831956 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/36, H01Q1/38, H01Q1/12, H01Q1/32 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
H01Q1/36 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q1/1271 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q1/3266 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q1/3275 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MINIATURANTENNE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2007/37] | English: | MINIATURE ANTENNA FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2007/37] | French: | ANTENNE MINIATURE POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 02.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/17] | 18.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6140975 (COHEN NATHAN [US]) [A] 1-34 * abstract ** column 11, line 23 - column 17, line 21 *; | [A]WO0154225 (FRACTUS SA [ES], et al) [A] 1-34 * page 9, line 12 - page 13, line 10 * * abstract *; | [X]WO03023900 (FRACTUS SA [ES], et al) [X] 1-34 * abstract * * page 11, line 24 - page 14, line 5 *; | [A]EP1313166 (ADVANCED AUTOMOTIVE ANTENNAS S [ES]) [A] 1-34 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] - [0032] *; | [X]US2004119644 (PUENTE-BALIARDA CARLES [ES], et al) [X] 1-34 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0086] - [0098] * * paragraphs [0059] - [0065] * |