EP1834011 - ETCHANT SOLUTIONS AND ADDITIVES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURDINSKI, Dirk c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BRANS, Harold c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | Schouten, Marcus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 05821559.1 | 30.11.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005IB53989 | Priority number, date | EP20040106303 | 06.12.2004 Original published format: EP 04106303 | EP20050102155 | 18.03.2005 Original published format: EP 05102155 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006061741 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1834011 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C23F/ | [2007/38] | CPC: |
C23F1/30 (EP,US);
C09K13/06 (KR);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C09K13/04 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEIZLÖSUNGEN UND ZUSATZSTOFFE DAFÜR | [2007/38] | English: | ETCHANT SOLUTIONS AND ADDITIVES THEREFOR | [2007/38] | French: | SOLUTIONS D'AGENT DE GRAVURE ET ADDITIFS CORRESPONDANTS | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/47] | 06.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3598741 (KANNO SHOZO) [X] 7,8 * column 1, lines 21-29 * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, lines 31-36 * * column 8, lines 17-23; example 6 * [Y] 10-15; | [X]US4215005 (MEY JOHN E VANDER [US]) [X] 7 * column 1, lines 13-17 * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 8 * * column 10; example IV * * column 10, line 44; table IV *; | [Y]US2004200575 (BIETSCH ALEXANDER [CH], et al) [Y] 10-15 * page 1, paragraphs 2,10-16 * * page 6, paragraph 75 - page 7, paragraph 76; figures 4A,4B *; | [PA]WO2005045524 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [PA] 1-15 * page 17 - page 18; example 4 *; | [A]US3677848 (STOLLER ARTHUR IRWIN, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, lines 31-46 * * claims 1,5 *; | [A]DE10043148 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 6 - page 3, paragraph 10 * * page 3, paragraphs 14-16 *; | [A]US3836410 (DU BOIS D) [A] 1-15 * column 3, lines 21-53 * | by applicant | US5512131 | WO03099463 | US3639185 | US3773670 | US4212907 | US4780176 | US4747907 | US4995942 | US5518131 | US6221269 | US4629539 | US4642168 | US5639344 | US5885888 | US4497687 | US4846918 | US4927700 | US5266152 | US5376214 | US5324496 | US4230522 | US5626775 | EP0774778 | US4345969 | US4220706 | US2004200575 | US4632727 | US3935118 | US4032379 | US2003010241 | - A. KUMAR ET AL., "The Use of Self Assembled Monolayers and a Selective Etch to Generate Patterned Gold Features", JOURNAL OF AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1992), vol. 114, pages 9188 - 9 | - A. KUMAR; G. M. WHITESIDES, "Features of Gold having micrometer to centimeter dimensions can be formed through a combination of stamping with an elastomeric stamp and an alkanethiol ink followed by chemical etching", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (1993), vol. 63, pages 2002 - 4 | - Y. XIA; E. KIM; G. M. WHITESIDES, "Microcontact printing of Alkanethiols on Silver and its Application in Microfabrication", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1996), vol. 143, pages 1070 - 9 | - Y. XIA ET AL., "Use of Electroless Silver as the substrate in microcontact printing of alkanethiols and its application in microfabrication", LANGMUIR, (1998), vol. 14, pages 363 - 71 | - J. TATE ET AL., "Anodization and Microcontact Printing on Electroless silver: Solution Based fabrication Procedures for low voltage Electronic Systems with Organic Active Components", LANGMUIR, (2000), vol. 16, pages 6054 - 60 | - B. PESIC; T. SEAL, "A Rotating Disk Study of Silver Dissolution with Thiourea in the presence of Ferric Sulphate", METALLURGICAL TRANSACTIONS B. PROCESS METALLURGY, (1990), vol. 21, pages 419 - 27 | - Y. GUAN; K. N. HAN, "The Dissolution Behaviour of Silver in Ammoniacal Solutions with Cupric Ammine", JOURNAL OF ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1994), vol. 141, pages 91 - 6 | - Y. GUAN; K. N. HAN, "The Dissolution Behaviour of Silver / Copper Alloys in Ammoniacal Solutions", MINERALS AND METALLURGICAL PROCESSING, (1994), vol. 11, pages 12 - 9 | - G. XUE; J. DONG, "Stable Silver Substrate Prepared by the Nitric Acid Etching Method for a Surface Enhanced Raman Scattering Study", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 63, pages 2393 - 7 | - R. PEREZ ET AL., "Study of Experimental Parameters for improved adsorbate detectability in SERS using etched silver substrates", SURFACE AND INTERFACE ANALYSIS, (2000), vol. 30, pages 592 - 6 | - S. O. IZIDINOV; A. M. SUSKIN; V. I. GAPONENKO, "Importance of kinetic and diffusion layer in the kinetics of coupled electrochemical reactions occurring in silicon etching in the HN03-HF system", SOVIET JOURNAL OF ELECTROCHEMISTRY, (1989), vol. 25, pages 418 - 25 | - M. SCHOLTEN; J. E. A. M. V. D. MEERAKKER, "On the mechanism ofITO Etching: The Specificity of Halogen Acids", JOURNAL OF ELETROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1993), vol. 140, pages 471 - 5 | - M. SCHOLTEN; J. E. A. M. V. D. MEERAKKER, "On the mechanism of ITO Etching: The Specificity of Halogen Acids", JOURNAL OF ELETROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1993), vol. 140, pages 471 - 5 | - J. E. A. M. V. D. MEERAKKER; P. C. BAARSLAG; M. SCHOLTEN, "On the mechanism of ITO Etching in Halogen Acids: The Influence of Oxidizing Agents", JOURNAL OF ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1995), vol. 142, pages 2321 - 5 | - L. B. GOETTING; T. DENG; G. M. WHITESIDES, "Microcontact printing of Alkanephosphonic acids on Aluminium: Pattern Transfer by Wet Chemical Etching", LANGMUIR, (1999), vol. 15, pages 1182 - 91 | - M. GEISSLER ET AL., "Defect Tolerant and Directional Wet Etch Systems for using Monolayers as Resists", LANGMUIR, (2002), vol. 18, pages 2374 - 7 | - M. FRENCH; S. E. CREAGER, "Enhanced Barrier Properties of Alkanethiol-Coated Gold Electrodes by 1-Octanol in Solution", LANGMUIR, (1998), vol. 14, pages 2129 - 33 | - S. E. CREAGER; G. K. ROWE, "Alcohol Aggregation at Hydrophobic Monolayer Surfaces and its Effect on Interfacial Redox Chemistry", LANGMUIR, (1993), vol. 9, pages 2330 - 6 | - C. D. BAIN; P. B. DAVIES; R. N. WARD, "In-Situ Sum-Frequency Spectroscopy of Sodium Dodecyl Sulfate and Dodecanol Coadsorbed at a Hydrophobic Surface", LANGMUIR, (1994), vol. 10, pages 2060 - 3 | - R. N. WARD; P. B. DAVIES; C. D. BAIN, "Coadsorption of Sodium Dodecyl Sulfate and Dodecanol at a Hydrophobic Surface", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY B, (1997), vol. 101, pages 1594 - 601 | - S. O. IZIDINOV; A. M. SUSLDN; V. I. GAPONENKO, "Importance of kinetic and diffusion layer in the kinetics of coupled electrochemical reactions occurring in silicon etching in the HN03-HF system", SOVIET JOURNAL OF ELECTROCHEMISTRY, (1989), vol. 25, pages 418 - 25 | - A. F. HOLLEMAN; E. WIEBERG, Lehrbuch der Anorganischen Chemie, WALTER DE GRUYTER, (1985), pages 91 - 100 | - C. C. ADDISON; DINITROGEN TETROXIDE, "Nitric Acid, and Their Mixtures as Media for Inorganic Reactions", CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (1980), vol. 80, pages 21 - 39 | - C. C. ADDISON, "Dinitrogen Tetroxide, Nitric Acid, and Their Mixtures as Media for Inorganic Reactions", CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (1980), vol. 80, pages 21 - 39 | - F. W. KUSTER; A THIEL, Rechentafeln fur die Chemische Analyse, WALTER DE GRUYTER, (1985), vol. 103 | - J. MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1992), pages 1167 - 71 |