EP1833891 - MEDICAL DEVICES AND PROCESSES FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited P.O. Box 1317 Seaston House Hastings Christ Church / BB | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURGMEIER, Robert 2740 Garland Lane North Plymouth, Minnesota 55447 / US | 02 /
HORN, Daniel J. 291 Poplar Drive Shoreview, Minnesota 55126 / US | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | Lang, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Bardehle, Heinz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/38] | Maiwald, Walter Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05822591.3 | 26.10.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005US38808 | Priority number, date | US20040005734 | 07.12.2004 Original published format: US 5734 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006062611 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1833891 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1833891 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/12, A61L29/00, A61M25/00 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
C08J7/12 (EP,US);
A61L29/085 (EP,US);
A61L29/14 (EP,US);
C08J7/126 (EP,US);
C08J7/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2007/38] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICES AND PROCESSES FOR PREPARING SAME | [2007/38] | French: | DISPOSITIFS MÉDICAUX ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 09.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.06.2010 | BE | 16.06.2010 | CY | 16.06.2010 | CZ | 16.06.2010 | DK | 16.06.2010 | EE | 16.06.2010 | FI | 16.06.2010 | IT | 16.06.2010 | LT | 16.06.2010 | LV | 16.06.2010 | NL | 16.06.2010 | PL | 16.06.2010 | RO | 16.06.2010 | SE | 16.06.2010 | SI | 16.06.2010 | SK | 16.06.2010 | TR | 16.06.2010 | BG | 16.09.2010 | GR | 17.09.2010 | ES | 27.09.2010 | IS | 16.10.2010 | PT | 18.10.2010 | GB | 26.10.2010 | LU | 26.10.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | FR | 02.11.2010 | HU | 17.12.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/42] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
TR | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 16.09.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
GB | 26.10.2010 | ||
LU | 26.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
HU | 17.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
TR | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
GB | 26.10.2010 | ||
LU | 26.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
HU | 17.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
GB | 26.10.2010 | ||
LU | 26.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
HU | 17.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
GB | 26.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
HU | 17.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
GB | 26.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
GB | 26.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6485665 ; | [A]US4404256 (ANAND MADHU [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [X]US4536179 (ANDERSON MICHAEL H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8-21,24,27 * column 2, line 9 - column 2, line 23; claims 1,2,4-6,8 *; | [A]US4902529 (REBHAN DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-27* the whole document *; | [X]US6156435 (GLEASON KAREN K [US], et al) [X] 18-20 * column 2, line 51 - column 2, line 64; claim 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890705), vol. 013, no. 290, Database accession no. (C - 614), & JP01085665 A 19890330 (TERUMO CORP) [X] 18-20 * abstract * |