EP1976775 - METHOD FOR DISPENSING CONTENT FROM AN AEROSOL CONTAINER AND OPERATING DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SUCH A METHOD, AN ASSEMBLY, AN AEROSOL CONTAINER AND A DISPENSING CAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friesland Brands B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL | [2010/38] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Friesland Brands B.V. Blankenstein 142 7943 PE Meppel / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLAUWAERT, Werner, Marie, Camie Taaiboomstraat 15 1702 Groot Bijgaarden / BE | 02 /
DUMON, Annick Roelstraat 17F 3440 Zoutleeuw / BE | 03 /
VAN DER SCHOOR, Thomas Schiebroeksestraat 8B 3037 RV Rotterdam / NL | [2010/09] |
Former [2008/41] | 01 /
CLAUWAERT, Werner, Marie, Camie Taaiboomstraat 15 B-1702 Groot Bijgaarden / BE | ||
02 /
DUMON, Annick Roelstraat 17F B-3440 Zoutleeuw / BE | |||
03 /
VAN DER SCHOOR, Thomas Schiebroeksestraat 8B NL-3037 RV Rotterdam / NL | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 05822969.1 | 21.12.2005 | [2008/41] | WO2005NL00880 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007073148 | Date: | 28.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1976775 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1976775 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/16 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
B65D83/52 (EP);
B65D83/202 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Extension states | AL | 18.07.2008 | BA | 18.07.2008 | HR | 18.07.2008 | MK | 18.07.2008 | YU | 18.07.2008 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABGABE VON INHALT AUS EINEM AEROSOLBEHÄLTER UND BETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG SOLCH EINES VERFAHRENS SOWIE ANORDNUNG, AEROSOLBEHÄLTER UND AUSGABEKAPPE | [2008/41] | English: | METHOD FOR DISPENSING CONTENT FROM AN AEROSOL CONTAINER AND OPERATING DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SUCH A METHOD, AN ASSEMBLY, AN AEROSOL CONTAINER AND A DISPENSING CAP | [2008/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE DISTRIBUTION DU CONTENU D'UN RESERVOIR D'AEROSOL ET DISPOSITIF D'EXPLOITATION POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE UN TEL PROCEDE, ENSEMBLE, RESERVOIR D'AEROSOL ET CAPSULE DE DISTRIBUTION | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.07.2010 | CY | 21.07.2010 | CZ | 21.07.2010 | EE | 21.07.2010 | FI | 21.07.2010 | LT | 21.07.2010 | LV | 21.07.2010 | RO | 21.07.2010 | SI | 21.07.2010 | SK | 21.07.2010 | TR | 21.07.2010 | BG | 21.10.2010 | IS | 21.11.2010 | PT | 22.11.2010 | GB | 21.12.2010 | IE | 21.12.2010 | LU | 21.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2010 | LI | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | HU | 22.01.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LV | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
IS | 21.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
GB | 21.12.2010 | ||
IE | 21.12.2010 | ||
LU | 21.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
HU | 22.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LV | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
IS | 21.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
GB | 21.12.2010 | ||
IE | 21.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
HU | 22.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LV | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
IS | 21.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
GB | 21.12.2010 | ||
IE | 21.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LV | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
IS | 21.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
IE | 21.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LV | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
IS | 21.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LV | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
IS | 21.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LV | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
IS | 21.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LV | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
IS | 21.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
IS | 21.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
LT | 21.07.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2001287782 ; | [X]US4570824 (BOLLING YVONNE [US]) [X] 1,5,14-17,21,28 * column 4, line 8 - column 6, line 23; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2005178802 (GROH DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 31,32* paragraph [0020]; figure 3 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020402), vol. 2002, no. 02, & JP2001287782 A 20011016 (DAIZO:KK) [X] 1,5,14-16 * abstract * |