EP1833818 - 6-(1H-PYRAZOL-5-YL)-1,3,5-TRIAZINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS PROTECTIVE AGENTS AGAINST UV RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISDIN, S.A. Av. Diagonal, 520 08006 Barcelona / ES | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRULLAS, Carles Antonio Puig, S.A. Potosí 21 E-08030 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
PELEJERO, Carles Antonio Puig, S.A. Potosí 21 E-08030 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
PANYELLA, David Antonio Puig, S.A. Potosí 21 E-08030 Barcelona / ES | 04 /
CORBERA, Jordi Laboratorios del Dr. Esteve, S.A. Av. de la Mare de Dèu de Montserrat 221 08041 Barcelona / ES | 05 /
HOLENZ, Jorg Laboratorios del Dr. Esteve, S.A. Av. de la Mare de Dèu de Montserrat 221 E-08041 Barcelona / ES | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | ZBM Patents Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2007/38] | Barlocci, Anna, et al ZBM Patents Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen C/ Balmes, 114 - 4º 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 05823239.8 | 14.12.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005IB03931 | Priority number, date | ES20040002986 | 16.12.2004 Original published format: ES 200402986 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006064366 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1833818 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/04 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
C07D403/04 (EP,ES);
A61K31/53 (ES);
A61K8/494 (ES);
A61P17/00 (EP);
C07D403/14 (EP,ES)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 6-(1H-PYRAZOL-5-YL)-1,3,5-TRIAZINDERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS SCHUTZMITTEL GEGEN UV-STRAHLUNG | [2007/38] | English: | 6-(1H-PYRAZOL-5-YL)-1,3,5-TRIAZINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS PROTECTIVE AGENTS AGAINST UV RADIATION | [2007/38] | French: | DERIVES DE 6- (1H-PYRAZOL-5-YL)-1, 3, 5-TRIAZINE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME AGENTS DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES RAYONNEMENTS UV | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 13.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 05.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1380583 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH]) [Y] 1-42 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0165608 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-42 * page 53 - page 54; claims 1,2 * * page 59; claim 19 * * page 6, line 1 - line 7 * * page 13, paragraph 4 *; | [DA]WO03075875 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [DA] 1-42 * the whole document; in particular, page 42, the compound (101a) *; | [A]WO2004064797 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-42 * the whole document; in particular, page 38, example 2 * |