EP1834062 - DOWNHOLE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toolbox Drilling Solutions Ltd Unit 2 Amber Business Court Rawmarsh Road Rotherham South Yorkshire S60 1RU / GB | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states Toolbox Drilling Solutions Ltd 46 Richmondhill Place Aberdeen AB15 5EP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLLERENSHAW, Andrew 13 Dunkerley Road, Loxley Sheffield S6 6RB / GB | 02 /
RUSSELL, Mark Thorn House, Bradfield Sheffield S6 6LB / GB | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Lunt, Mark George Francis, et al HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Lunt, Mark George Francis, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2007/38] | Lunt, Mark George Francis, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green GB-Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05823776.9 | 20.12.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005GB04932 | Priority number, date | GB20050000019 | 04.01.2005 Original published format: GB 0500019 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006072761 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1834062 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E21B10/32, E21B7/06, E21B17/10, E21B41/00 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
E21B10/265 (EP,US);
E21B17/1014 (EP,US);
E21B7/062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BOHRLOCHWERKZEUG | [2007/38] | English: | DOWNHOLE TOOL | [2007/38] | French: | OUTIL DE FOND | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 14.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/42] | 01.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3054452 (CLARK JR EARNEST H, et al) [A] 2,3 * column 5, line 42 - line 60; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3123162 (ROWLEY D S) [A] 1,11,21 * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 22; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US3955623 (AUMANN JAMES T) [A] 2,3* column 3, line 23 - line 26; figure 2a *; | [A]WO9931352 (SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [A] 2,3 * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 2; figures 2f,4d *; | [A]US6213226 (EPPINK JAY M [US], et al) [A] 1,11,22,23 * column 12, line 17 - column 13, line 15; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US2002070052 (ARMELL RICHARD A [GB], et al) [A] 1,7-14,17-23 * page 2, paragraph 19 - paragraph 26; figures 1a,1b * |