EP1842198 - HIGH DENSITY, HYBRID OPTICAL DISC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/41] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, Quai A. Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOWN, John, Matthew 361 Saddle Lane Ojai, California 93023 / US | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/41] | 01 /
TOWN, John, Matthew 2963 Cove Trace Charlottesville, Virginia 22911 / US | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Uhlig, Thomas Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/06] | Schmidt-Uhlig, Thomas Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Thomson, European Patent Operations, 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05824741.2 | 31.10.2005 | [2007/41] | WO2005US39321 | Priority number, date | US20050646702P | 25.01.2005 Original published format: US 646702 P | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006080964 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1842198 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/12, G11B7/007, G11B7/24 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
G11B20/1262 (EP,US);
G11B7/24024 (KR);
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B7/24038 (EP,US);
G11B7/24041 (KR);
G11B7/266 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHDICHTER HYBRIDER OPTISCHER DATENTRÄGER | [2007/41] | English: | HIGH DENSITY, HYBRID OPTICAL DISC | [2007/41] | French: | DISQUE OPTIQUE HYBRIDE HAUTE DENSITE | [2007/41] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 26.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/32] | 23.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2001176129 ; | [A]US6434107 (ARTIGALAS MAX [FR], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9831011 (WEA MFG INC [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 27 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]JP2003308631 ; | [A]JPH11120617 ; | [A]US5732065 (BRAAT JOSEPHUS J M [NL], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0745985 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * column 6, line 29 - column 11, line 59 * * figures 4-6 *; | [A]EP0520619 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,14,21,22 * abstract * * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 22 * * figures 3,4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010210), vol. 2000, no. 23, & JP2001176129 A 20010629 (VICTOR CO OF JAPAN LTD) [X] 1-23 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003308631 A 20031031 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1-23 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11120617 A 19990430 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-23 * abstract * |