EP1807950 - DISTRIBUTED ANTENNA SYSTEM USING OVERHEAD POWER LINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corridor Systems, Inc. 3800 Rolling Oaks Road Santa Rosa CA 95404 / US | [2007/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELMORE, Glenn, e. 446 Halter Court Santa Rosa, CA 95401 / US | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05824768.5 | 28.10.2005 | [2007/29] | WO2005US39404 | Priority number, date | US20040623291P | 28.10.2004 Original published format: US 623291 P | [2007/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006050331 | Date: | 11.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1807950 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00, G05B11/01 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
H04B3/56 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5441 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5483 (EP,US);
H04H20/84 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERTEILTES ANTENNENSYSTEM MIT HÄNGESTROMLEITUNGEN | [2007/29] | English: | DISTRIBUTED ANTENNA SYSTEM USING OVERHEAD POWER LINES | [2007/29] | French: | SYSTEME D'ANTENNE DISTRIBUE COMPRENANT DES LIGNES AERIENNES DE TRANSPORT D'ENERGIE | [2007/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 12.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/08] | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004135676 (BERKMAN WILLIAM H [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * abstract * * paragraph [0223] - paragraph [0225] * * figure 12 *; | [X]US5977650 (RICKARD ROBIN PAUL [GB], et al) [X] 1-25 * abstract * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 67 * * column 8, line 44 - line 61 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]GB2293950 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002110310 (KLINE PAUL A [US]) [X] 1-25 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0070] * | International search | [X]US6151480 (FISCHER LARRY G [US], et al); | [Y]US2004054425 (ELMORE GLENN [US]); | [P]US2005111533 (BERKMAN WILLIAM H [US], et al) |