EP1809258 - DOSAGE FORMS HAVING A MICRORELIEFED SURFACE AND METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McNeil-PPC, Inc. Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US | [2007/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUNICK, Frank, J. 47 Long Ridge Road Randolph, NJ 08769 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Jen-Chi 80 Annamarie Drive Morrisville, PA 19067 / US | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square LONDON WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05825066.3 | 26.10.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005US38795 | Priority number, date | US20040622630P | 27.10.2004 Original published format: US 622630 P | US20050236446 | 27.09.2005 Original published format: US 236446 | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006047690 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1809258 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1809258 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K9/28, A61J3/00, B29C33/30, B29C33/42, B29C45/26, B29C33/56, B29C45/37 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
A61J3/007 (EP,US);
A61K9/2072 (EP,US);
A61K9/2095 (EP,US);
A61K9/2893 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
B29C33/565 (EP,US);
B29C45/2673 (EP,US);
B29C45/372 (EP,US);
B41F17/36 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2008/05] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DARREICHUNGSFORMEN MIT MIKRORELIEFOBERFLÄCHE SOWIE VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2007/30] | English: | DOSAGE FORMS HAVING A MICRORELIEFED SURFACE AND METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION | [2007/30] | French: | FORMES POSOLOGIQUES A SURFACE A MICRORELIEF ET PROCEDES ET APPAREIL D'OBTENTION DE CELLES-CI | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 21.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 14.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 27.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 07.04.2010 | IE | 26.10.2010 | [2011/47] |
Former [2011/16] | IT | 07.04.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO03026628 (MCNEIL PPC INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0039] * * figure - * * claim - *; | [Y]WO03028619 (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [Y] 1-7,8-15 * page 2, line 24 - line 30 * * page 35, line 1 - line 12 * * page 41, line 33 - page 42, line 9; figures 48-50 * * page 46, lines 1-5; figures 52-54 * * page 31, line 18 - page 32, line 6 * * figures 4,31-35 *; | [A]US2004175425 (SOWDEN HARRY S [US]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1,1A-1D * * paragraph [0141] * * paragraph [0173] - paragraph [0177]; figures 12,13 *; | [DA]WO0110464 (DIMENSIONAL FOODS CORP [US], et al) [DA] 1-7 * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, paragraph 4 * * page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 14 - page 17; example - * * figure - * * claim - *; | [Y]US5538674 (NISPER JON [US], et al) [Y] 8-15 * column 7, line 15 - column 8, line 2 * * figures 5,6 *; | [A]EP1201408 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 12-14 * paragraphs [0025] , [0032] * * claim 1 * * figures 9-11 *; | [A]JP2000153543 (KURARAY CO) [A] 8-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0013] * * figure - *; | [A]US2001050155 (BILLIET ROMAIN L [MY], et al) [A] 8,12 * paragraphs [0039] , [0040] * * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] * * figures 2a-4 *; | [A]WO03020246 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [A] 8,12 * claims 1-19 * * figure - * |