EP1820276 - TURBO DECODER WITH STAKE HERITAGE FOR DATA BLOCK REDUNDANT VERSION DECODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2009/50] |
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANCORA, Andrea, c/o Société Civile SPID 156 Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 PARIS / FR | 02 /
TOMATIS, Fabrizio, c/o Société Civile SPID 156 Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 PARIS / FR | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Schuffenecker, Thierry 120 Chemin de la Maure 06800 Cagnes-sur-Mer / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Schuffenecker, Thierry 120 Chemin de la Maure 06800 Cagnes sur Mer / FR | ||
Former [2008/33] | White, Andrew Gordon NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2007/34] | White, Andrew Gordon NXP Semiconductors IP Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05825379.0 | 30.11.2005 | [2007/34] | WO2005IB53963 | Priority number, date | EP20040300839 | 02.12.2004 Original published format: EP 04300839 | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006059280 | Date: | 08.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1820276 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/29 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
H04L1/1835 (EP,US);
H03M13/2957 (EP,US);
H03M13/2975 (EP,US);
H03M13/3723 (EP,US);
H03M13/3972 (EP,US);
H04L1/005 (EP,US);
H04L1/0066 (EP,US);
H03M13/6306 (EP,US);
H04L1/08 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TURBODECODER MIT STAKE-WEITERGABE FÜR DATENBLOCKREDUNDANTE VERSIONSDEKODIERUNG | [2007/34] | English: | TURBO DECODER WITH STAKE HERITAGE FOR DATA BLOCK REDUNDANT VERSION DECODING | [2007/34] | French: | TURBODECODEUR COMPRENANT UN HERITAGE DE REPERE POUR LE DECODAGE D'UNE VERSION REDONDANTE D'UN BLOC DE DONNEES | [2007/34] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 26.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/47] | 12.02.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/47] | 04.07.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO03098811 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004028004 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [DA]US6732327 (HEINILA MARKO [FI]) [DA] 1,10* the whole document *; | [Y] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS)", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200406), vol. 3-R1, no. V590, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014016688 [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [4.5.1] * | [Y] - M. MARANDIAN ET AL., "Performance analysis of turbo decoder for 3GPP standard using the sliding window algorithm", 12TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS. PIMRC 2001., San Diego, (20010930), pages E-127 - E-131, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/xpls/abs_all.jsp?arnumber=965275, (20061020), XP002403879 [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [00IV] * | [A] - FRENGER P ET AL, "Performance comparison of HARQ with chase combining and incremental redundancy for HSDPA", VTC FALL 2001. IEEE 54TH. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. PROCEEDINGS. ATLANTIC CITY, NJ, OCT. 7 - 11, 2001, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20011007), VOL. 1 OF 4. CONF. 54, ISBN 0-7803-7005-8, pages 1829 - 1833, XP010562280 [A] 5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VTC.2001.956516 |