EP1982441 - A RELAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2008/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOPPLER, Klaus Otsonkallio 2 B 27 FIN-02110 Espoo / FI | 02 /
RIIHONEN, Taneli Jamerantaival 11 G 156 FIN-02150 Espoo / FI | 03 /
HOTTINEN, Ari Ristiniementie 4 o 30 FIN-Espoo 02320 / FI | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 05825745.2 | 16.12.2005 | [2008/43] | WO2005IB04096 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007068999 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1982441 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
H04B7/15507 (EP,US);
H04B7/15542 (EP,US);
H04B7/1555 (EP,US);
H04B7/2041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RELAIS | [2008/43] | English: | A RELAY | [2008/43] | French: | RELAIS | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 17.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/08] | 06.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1333596 (HUTCHISON WHAMPOA THREE G IP [BS]) [X] 1-8,11-16,23,24,36-40,49,1-8,11-16,23,24,36-40,49,1-8,11-16,23,24,36-40,49 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] *; | [X]US2002028655 (ROSENER DOUGLAS K [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11-16,23,24,36-40,49,1-8,11-16,23,24,36-40,49,1-8,11-16,23,24,36-40,49 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0057] *; | [X]US6061023 (DANIEL SAM MORDOCHAI [US], et al) [X] 1,39,49,1,39,49,1,39,49 * column 2, line 6 - line 24 * * column 3, line 51 - column 7, line 18 * * column 2, line 6 - line 24 * * column 3, line 51 - column 7, line 18 * * column 2, line 6 - line 24 * * column 3, line 51 - column 7, line 18 * | by applicant | US6282425 | EP1333596 | US2002028655 | US6061023 |