EP1827109 - USE OF NATURAL PLANT EXTRACTS IN COSMETICS COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avon Products, Inc. 777 Third Avenue New York, NY 10017 / US | [2013/11] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states AVON PRODUCTS, INC. 1251 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10020-1196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HINES, Michelle, D. 118 Shasta Drive Hickory, TX 75063-3611 / US | 02 /
DUGGAN, Michele, C. 33 Kennedy Terrance Middletown, NY 10940 / US | 03 /
BINETTI, Ralph, R. 134 Sylvan Knoll Road Stamford, Connecticut 06902 / US | [2007/46] |
Former [2007/42] | 01 /
HINES, Michelle, D. 118 Shasta Drive Hickory, TX 75063-3611 / US | ||
02 /
DUGGAN, Michele, C. 33 Kennedy Terrance Middletown, NY 10940 / US | |||
03 /
BINETTI, Ralph, R. 105 Hayestown Road Danbury, CT 06811 / US | |||
Former [2007/36] | 01 /
HINES, Michelle, D. 500 Drexel Drive Lewisville, TX 75067 / US | ||
02 /
DUGGAN, Michele, C. 33 Kennedy Terrance Middletown, NY 10940 / US | |||
03 /
BINETTI, Ralph, R. 105 Hayestown Road Danbury, CT 06811 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/01] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05825815.3 | 28.11.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US42839 | Priority number, date | US20040021047 | 22.12.2004 Original published format: US 21047 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006068777 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1827109 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1827109 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/888, A61Q19/06, A61K36/185, A61K36/19, A61K36/48, A61K8/9789, A61K8/9794, A61P17/00, A61P17/18, A61K36/67 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61K8/97 (BR);
A61K36/185 (EP,BR,US);
A61K36/19 (EP,US);
A61K36/48 (EP,US);
A61K36/67 (EP,US);
A61K36/888 (EP,US);
A61K8/9794 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K36/185, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/19, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/48, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/67, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2015/25] | A01N65/00, A61K36/888, A61Q19/06, A61K8/97, A61K36/19, A61K36/185, A61K36/48, A61K36/67 | ||
Former IPC [2007/36] | A01N65/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/01] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG NATÜRLICHER PFLANZENEXTRAKTE FÜR KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2007/36] | English: | USE OF NATURAL PLANT EXTRACTS IN COSMETICS COMPOSITIONS | [2007/36] | French: | UTILISATION D'EXTRAITS VEGETAUX NATURELS DANS DES COMPOSITIONS COSMETIQUES | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 25.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 10.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.11.2005 | AT | 06.01.2021 | CY | 06.01.2021 | CZ | 06.01.2021 | DK | 06.01.2021 | EE | 06.01.2021 | ES | 06.01.2021 | FI | 06.01.2021 | LT | 06.01.2021 | LV | 06.01.2021 | MC | 06.01.2021 | NL | 06.01.2021 | RO | 06.01.2021 | SE | 06.01.2021 | SI | 06.01.2021 | SK | 06.01.2021 | BG | 06.04.2021 | GR | 07.04.2021 | IS | 06.05.2021 | PT | 06.05.2021 | [2023/29] |
Former [2023/24] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09143025 (ARUSOA OUSHIYOU KK) [X] 1-25 * abstract *; | [X]JPH1036217 (POLA CHEM IND INC) [X] 1-10,20-25 * abstract *; | [X]JPH1045542 (POLA CHEM IND INC) [X] 1-10,20-25 * abstract *; | [X]JP2000239146 (ARSOA HONSYA CORP) [X] 1-25 * abstract *; | [X]JP2001220320 (MANDOM CORP) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP1455749 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-25 * paragraphs [0024] , [0 86]; claims 1, 3; table 5 *; | [X] - ASWAL B S ET AL, "SCREENING OF INDIAN PLANTS FOR BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITY 11", INDIAN JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, COUNCIL OF SCIENTIFIC & INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH, IN, (19840101), vol. 22, no. 9, ISSN 0019-5189, pages 487 - 504, XP009077080 [X] 1-10 * page 1 and 12 * | [X] - BHAMARAPRAVATI S ET AL, "Extracts of spice and food plants from Thai traditional medicine inhibit thegrowth of the human carcinogen Helicobacter pylori", IN VIVO: INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL AND CLINICAL PATHOPHYSIOLOGY AND DRUG RESEARCH, INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE OF ANTICANCER RESEARCH, GR, (20031211), vol. 17, no. 6, ISSN 0258-851X, pages 541 - 544, XP008081795 [X] 1-10 * page 1; table 1 * | [T] - Edward Hammond, "The Avon Lady comes collecting Asian Medicinal Plants", Third World Network, (20120501), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://twnside.org.sg/title2/briefing_papers/No64.pdf, (20131213), XP055093354 [T] * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH1036217 (POLA CHEM IND INC) | by applicant | US4379454 | US4820724 | US4956171 | US5146846 | US5223262 | US5770222 | US5834513 | US5847003 | - International Cosmetic Ingredient Dictionary and Handbook, Cosmetic, Toiletry, and Fragrance Association (CTFA, (20040000), pages 2177 - 2299 |