EP1814940 - MICROSPHERE FILLED POLYMER COMPOSITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARX, Ryan, E. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
D'SOUZA, Andrew, S. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
HANLEY, Kenneth, J. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
ISRAELSON, Ronald, J. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
LONGABACH, John, W. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
NELSON, James, M. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
SHEFELBINE, Terri, A. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/32] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05826053.0 | 16.11.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005US41489 | Priority number, date | US20040628335P | 16.11.2004 Original published format: US 628335 P | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006055612 | Date: | 26.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1814940 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08K7/28, C08L53/00 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08K7/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/16 (KR);
C08L53/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C08K7/14 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/10, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L53/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L53/00, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L53/00, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L53/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L53/02, C08L2666/04 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROKUGELGEFÜLLTE POLYMERVERBUNDWERKSTOFFE | [2007/32] | English: | MICROSPHERE FILLED POLYMER COMPOSITES | [2007/32] | French: | COMPOSITES POLYMERES REMPLIS DE MICROSPHERES | [2007/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 21.02.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH06256642 ; | [X]JPH06322236 ; | [X]JPH05230294 ; | [X]EP0557807 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-12 * examples 4,6-9; tables 1,2 *; | [X]WO03087205 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-3,6-12 * page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 17 * * examples 1,2,5 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 41, Database accession no. 1994-330276, XP002370811 & JPH06256642 A 19940913 (ASAHI KASEI KOGYO KK) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0017] - [0019] * * table 2 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 06, Database accession no. 1995-041465, XP002370812 & JPH06322236 A 19941122 (SANYO CHEM IND LTD) [X] 1-3,6,7,9-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 40, Database accession no. 1993-317646, XP002370815 & JPH05230294 A 19930907 (KURARAY CO LTD) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] , [0028] * |