EP1829790 - NON-REFILLABLE CAP FOR BOTTLES CONTAINING ALCOHOL AND SIMILAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plastivit, S.A. Viladomat, 321, 2 08029 Barcelona / ES | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARCIA RIBA, Jordi Avda. Fabregada, 40 E-08907 L'HOSPITALET DE LLOBREGAT(BARCEL / ES | 02 /
MARTIN, LOPEZ, Eduardo Avda. Pompeu Fabra s/n, Pol. Ind. Puigbac E-08570 Torello / ES | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Curell Aguilà, Marcelino, et al CURELL SUÑOL S.L.P. Passeig de Gràcia 65 bis 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Curell Aguilà, Marcelino, et al Dr. Ing. M. Curell Sunol I.I. S.L. Agentes de la Propiedad Industrial Passeig de Gracia, 65 bis 08008 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2007/36] | Durán Moya, Luis-Alfonso, et al Durán-Corretjer Còrsega, 329 (Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal) E-08037 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 05826209.8 | 13.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005ES00676 | Priority number, date | ES20040002990 | 16.12.2004 Original published format: ES 200402990 | ES20050003045 | 12.12.2005 Original published format: ES 200503045 | [2007/36] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006064069 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1829790 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 22.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/34 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
B65D41/3447 (EP);
B65D49/00 (EP);
B65D49/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | 26.06.2007 | BA | 26.06.2007 | HR | 26.06.2007 | MK | 26.06.2007 | YU | 26.06.2007 | Title | German: | NICHT WIEDERAUFFÜLLBARE KAPPE FÜR ALKOHOL ODER DERGLEICHEN ENTHALTENDE FLASCHEN | [2007/36] | English: | NON-REFILLABLE CAP FOR BOTTLES CONTAINING ALCOHOL AND SIMILAR | [2007/36] | French: | BOUCHON NON REMPLISSABLE POUR BOUTEILLES DE LIQUEUR ET AUTRES BOUTEILLES SEMBLABLES | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2007 | Translation filed | 26.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 10.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/24] | 26.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 29.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 29.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.11.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19708909 ; | [A]JP2003054597 ; | [A]US2003192853 ; | [A]JPH1035700 ; | [A]JP2001130606 |