EP1970464 - CATHODE EVAPORATION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUNDACION TEKNIKER Avda. Otaola, n 20 20600 Eibar-Guipuzcoa / ES | [2008/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOIKOETXEA LARRINAGA, Josu Avda. Otaola, 20 E-20600 Eibar (guipuzcoa) / ES | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 05826678.4 | 16.12.2005 | [2008/38] | WO2005ES00687 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007068768 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1970464 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1970464 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 21.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/32, H01J37/32 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
C23C14/325 (EP,US);
C23C14/243 (EP,US);
H01J37/32055 (EP,US);
H01J37/32614 (EP,US);
H01J37/3266 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATHODENVERDAMPFUNGSMASCHINE | [2008/38] | English: | CATHODE EVAPORATION MACHINE | [2008/38] | French: | MACHINE D'EVAPORATION CATHODIQUE | [2008/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2008 | Translation filed | 09.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 11.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.03.2010 | BE | 03.03.2010 | CY | 03.03.2010 | CZ | 03.03.2010 | DK | 03.03.2010 | EE | 03.03.2010 | FI | 03.03.2010 | LT | 03.03.2010 | LV | 03.03.2010 | PL | 03.03.2010 | RO | 03.03.2010 | SE | 03.03.2010 | SI | 03.03.2010 | SK | 03.03.2010 | TR | 03.03.2010 | BG | 03.06.2010 | GR | 04.06.2010 | IS | 03.07.2010 | PT | 05.07.2010 | HU | 04.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 03.07.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
HU | 04.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 03.07.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 03.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4734183 (WIRZ PETER [DE], et al); | [A]US4927513 (SCHULTHEISS EBERHARD [DE], et al); | [A]US5022978 (HENSEL BERND [DE], et al); | [Y]US5160595 (HAUZER FRANSISCUS J M [NL], et al); | [A]DE10010448 (MULTI MEDIA MACHINERY GMBH [DE]); | [Y]ES2228830T (FUNDACION TEKNIKER) | by applicant | US4673477 | US4724058 | US5298136 | US5861088 | WO02077318 | EP1382711 | ES2228830T |