EP1848974 - KNOCK DETERMINATION DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken, 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken, 448-8661 / JP | |||
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken, 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEKO, Rihito, c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 4718571 / JP | 02 /
KASASHIMA, Kenji, c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 4718571 / JP | 03 /
SENDA, Kenji, c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 4718571 / JP | 04 /
KAMIO, Shigeru, c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 4488661 / JP | 05 /
INOUE, Masaomi, c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 4488661 / JP | 06 /
TAKEMURA, Yuichi, c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 4488661 / JP | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen, Rainer-Andreas, et al Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Fresing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | Kuhnen, Rainer-Andreas, et al KUHNEN & WACKER Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 05842253.6 | 20.12.2005 | [2007/44] | WO2005JP23841 | Priority number, date | JP20040371898 | 22.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004371898 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006068280 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1848974 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1848974 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01L23/22 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
G01L23/225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2008/14] |
Former [2007/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLOPFBESTIMMUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2007/44] | English: | KNOCK DETERMINATION DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2007/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DETERMINATION DE DETONATION POUR UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 28.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0889309 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1,5 * page 3, line 37 - page 4, line 39; figure 2 * [Y] 2-4,6-8; | [XY]EP0732573 (MAGNETI MARELLI FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1,5 * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 46 * [Y] 2-4,6-8; | [XY]EP1221603 (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0019]; figure 3 * [Y] 2-4,6-8; | [Y]DE10215959 (UNIV KARLSRUHE TH INST FUER KO [DE]) [Y] 2,6 * abstract *; | [Y]US2004162668 (RAWLINSON STEPHEN [GB], et al) [Y] 3,4,7,8 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0084]; figures 6,17 * | Examination | GB2245382 | DE10300204 | by applicant | JP2001227400 | DE10300204 | GB2245382 | EP0889309 |