EP1824448 - CLOBETASOL PROPIONATE SHAMPOOS FOR THE TREATMENT OF SEBORRHEIC DERMATITIS OF THE SCALP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galderma S.A. Zugerstrasse 8 6330 Cham / CH | [2007/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISTUER, Florence Residence LTM Orée Lanterne BT les Bouleaux, 90 avenue Lanterne F-06200 Nice / FR | 02 /
LOESCHE, Christian 1 Place des Cines 06560 Valbonne / FR | 03 /
SOTO, Pascale Résidence Riviera Park, 1160 route Grasse bât. B2 06600 Antibes / FR | [2007/35] | Representative(s) | Boulard, Denis L'Oreal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92665 Asnieres-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2012/17] |
Former [2009/50] | Allab, Myriam L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | ||
Former [2007/35] | Allab, Myriam L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05849127.5 | 08.12.2005 | [2007/35] | WO2005EP14230 | Priority number, date | US20040634105P | 08.12.2004 Original published format: US 634105 P | US20040017665 | 22.12.2004 Original published format: US 17665 | [2007/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006061260 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1824448 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/63 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
A61K31/56 (EP,US);
A61K8/63 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/08 (EP);
A61Q5/02 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CLOBETASOL-PROPIONAT-SHAMPOOS ZUR BEHANDLUNG SEBORRHOISCHER DERMATITIS DER KOPFHAUT | [2007/35] | English: | CLOBETASOL PROPIONATE SHAMPOOS FOR THE TREATMENT OF SEBORRHEIC DERMATITIS OF THE SCALP | [2007/35] | French: | SHAMPOOINGS AU CLOBETASOL PROPIONATE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE DERMATITE SEBORRHEIQUE DU CUIR CHEVELU | [2007/35] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 17.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/16] | 28.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4835148 (BARFORD BRIAN D [US], et al) [X] 11 * column 1, line 14 - line 56; claims 7-9 * * column 8, line 53 - line 58 *; | [Y]WO9727862 (BELLARA MEDICAL PRODUCTS [AU], et al) [Y] 2,3,12 * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 29 *; | [A]US5972920 (SEIDEL WILLIAM E [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 16 - line 30; tables I-VI * * column 3, line 1 - line 58 *; | [YD]WO9965456 (GALDERMA RES & DEV [FR], et al) [YD] 5-7,13 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 17 * * page 5, line 6 - page 8, line 36; examples II,IV,VIII * * page 29, line 4 - line 10 *; | [XY] - JOHNSON B A ET AL, "TREATMENT OF SEBORRHEIC DERMATITIS", AMERICAN FAMILY PHYSICIAN, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, US, (20000501), vol. 61, no. 9, pages 2703 - 2710, XP000957794 [X] 1,4,7-11 * page 2706, paragraph LAST; table 1 * * page 2708, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 2709, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2709, column 2, paragraph LAST * [Y] 2,3,5,6,12,13 | [Y] - JARRATT MICHAEL ET AL, "Clobetasol propionate shampoo 0.05%: a new option to treat patients with moderate to severe scalp psoriasis.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200407), Database accession no. NLM15303780, XP002373328 [Y] 1-13 * abstract * | [Y] - JOURNAL OF DRUGS IN DERMATOLOGY : JDD. 2004 JUL-AUG, (200407), vol. 3, no. 4, ISSN 1545-9616, pages 367 - 373, XP009063933 [Y] 1-13 * page 368, column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3; figures 1-3 * * page 372, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 373, column 1, paragraph 3 * | [Y] - JASS H E, "OTC DRUG PRODUCTS FOR THE CONTROL OF DANDRUFF, SEBORRHEIC DERMATITIS, AND PSORIASIS", COSMETICS & TOILETRIES, WHEATON, IL, US, (198302), vol. 98, no. 2, ISSN 0361-4387, pages 64 - 69, XP000944159 [Y] 1-13 * page 65, column 1, line 6 - line 21; table II * * page 56, column 2, line 18 - line 22 * | [PX] - "Clobetasol propionate 0.05% shampoo in the treatment of seborrheic dermatitis of the scalp: Results of a pilot study", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF DERMATOLOGY, C.V. MOSBY, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, (200503), vol. 52, no. 3, ISSN 0190-9622, page P76, XP004840500 [PX] 1-4,7-12 * P805 * |