EP1836209 - CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF6-[(5S,9R)-9-(4-CYANOPHENYL)-3-(3,5-DICHLOROPHENYL)-1-METHYL-2,4-DIOXO-1,3,7-TRIAZASPIRO[4.4]NON-7-YL]NICOTINIC ACID AS INHIBITORS OF CD18 INTEGRINS, ICAMS AND/OR THE LFA-1:ICAM INTERACTION FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATIONS AND IMMUNE DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton NJ 05843-4000 / US | ||
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELMONTE, Albert J. 33 Stevens Road Edison, NJ 08817 / US | 02 /
DHAR, T. G. Murali 247 Crittenden Drive Newtown, PA 18940 / US | 03 /
GALELLA, Michael 54 Chipper Drive Kendall Park, NJ 08824 / US | 04 /
GLEESON, Margaret 121 Lorraine Drive Berkeley Heights, NJ 07922 / US | 05 /
GOUGOUTAS, Jack Z. 101 Westerly Road Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 06 /
MCLEOD, Douglas D. 25 Union Street Kingston, NJ 08528 / US | 07 /
ZHANG, Huiping 9 Hudnut Lane Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | 08 /
CHEN, Bang Chi 28 Marion Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | Beacham, Annabel Rose Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05849629.0 | 14.12.2005 | [2007/39] | WO2005US45251 | Priority number, date | US20040636012P | 14.12.2004 Original published format: US 636012 P | US20050301433 | 13.12.2005 Original published format: US 301433 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006065908 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1836209 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/10, A61P37/06, A61P19/02 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
C07D487/10 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P11/16 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/16 (EP);
A61P15/18 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/08 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P39/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRISTALLINE FORMEN VON 6-[(5S,9R)-9-(4-CYANOPHENYL)-3-(3,5-DICHLORPHENYL)-1-METHYL-2,4-DIOXO-1,3,7-TRIAZASPIRO[4,4]NON-7-YL]NIKOTINSÄURE ALS INHIBITOREN VON CD18-INTEGRINEN, ICAMS UND/ODER DER LFA1: ICAM-WECHSELWIRKUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDUNGEN UND IMMUNKRANKHEITEN | [2007/39] | English: | CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF6-[(5S,9R)-9-(4-CYANOPHENYL)-3-(3,5-DICHLOROPHENYL)-1-METHYL-2,4-DIOXO-1,3,7-TRIAZASPIRO[4.4]NON-7-YL]NICOTINIC ACID AS INHIBITORS OF CD18 INTEGRINS, ICAMS AND/OR THE LFA-1:ICAM INTERACTION FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATIONS AND IMMUNE DISEASES | [2007/39] | French: | FORMES CRISTALLINES D'ACIDE 6-[(5S, 9R)-9-(4-CYANOPHENYL)-3-(3, 5-DICHLOROPHENYL)-1-METHYL-2, 4-DIOXO-1, 3, 7-TRIAZASPIRO[4.4]NON-7-YL]NICOTINIQUE EN TANT QUE INHIBITEUR DE INTEGRINES CD18, ICAMS ET/OU L'INTERACTION LFA-1:ICAM POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE INFLAMATIONS ET MALADIES IMMUNE | [2007/39] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 18.04.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03029245 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * page 165; example 285 * * page 106; example 59 ** schmeme K, page 48; page 162; example 279 * |