EP1833459 - SILICONE MATERIAL FOR RELEASING AN ACTIVE MOLECULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bluestar Silicones France SAS 21 avenue Georges Pompidou 69003 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANNIBOIS, Hélène 25bis rue de La République F-94220 Charenton Le Pont / FR | 02 /
PUSINERI, Christian 33 rue des Fleurs 69360 Serezin du Rhône / FR | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Colombet, Alain André, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, Rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Colombet, Alain André, et al Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | ||
Former [2007/38] | Colombet, Alain André, et al Cabinet Lavoix, 62 rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05850608.0 | 23.12.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005FR03271 | Priority number, date | FR20040013931 | 24.12.2004 Original published format: FR 0413931 | [2007/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006070134 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1833459 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/89, A61K8/02, A61K8/37, A61Q19/00 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
A61K8/895 (EP,US);
A61K8/89 (KR);
A61K8/0208 (EP,US);
A61K8/34 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/375 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SILIKONMATERIAL ZUR FREISETZUNG EINES AKTIVEN MOLEKÜLS | [2007/38] | English: | SILICONE MATERIAL FOR RELEASING AN ACTIVE MOLECULE | [2007/38] | French: | MATERIAU SILICONE POUR LA LIBERATION D'UNE MOLECULE ACTIVE | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 12.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/52] | 30.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5968533 (PORTER STEVEN S [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * example 1; claim - *; | [X]WO9614822 (OSMOTICS CORP [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 11 * * page 11, line 6 - line 33 * * claims 3,4 *; | [Y]US6270783 (SLAVTCHEFF CRAIG STEPHEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * column 7, line 42 - column 7, line 57; example 4; claim - * * column 4, line 44 - column 4, line 60 *; | [Y]US6180133 (QUAN DANYI [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 25 * * column 7, line 15 - column 8, line 60 *; | [Y]WO9926571 (THERATECH INC [US]) [Y] 1-11 * page 5, line 20 - page 8, line 23 *; | [Y]US2002004064 (QUAN DANYI [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] * * paragraphs [0021] , [0022]; claim - * |