EP1830696 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING ABNORMALITY IN TOOTH STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN HERPEN, Maarten c/o Société Civile SPID 156 Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 PARIS / FR | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Damen, Daniel Martijn Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 05850879.7 | 15.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005IB54259 | Priority number, date | EP20040300923 | 20.12.2004 Original published format: EP 04300923 | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006067697 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1830696 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/103, A61B8/08 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
A61B5/0088 (EP,US);
A61B5/0095 (EP,US);
A61B5/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG VON ABNORMALITÄTEN BEI ZAHNSTRUKTUREN | [2007/37] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING ABNORMALITY IN TOOTH STRUCTURE | [2007/37] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DETECTION D'ANORMALITE D'UNE STRUCTURE DENTAIRE | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/01] | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO02054948 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [DA] 1,9,11* paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0046] *; | [A]US2004054268 (ESENALIEV RINAT [US], et al) [A] 1,6,10,11 * abstract *; | [X] - HARRIS DAVID M ET AL, "Pulsed Nd:YAG laser selective ablation of surface enamel caries: I. Photoacoustic response and FTIR spectroscopy", PROC SPIE INT SOC OPT ENG; PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING 2000 SOCIETY OF PHOTO-OPTICAL INSTRUMENTATION ENGINEERS, BELLINGHAM, WA, USA, (2000), vol. 3910, pages 164 - 170, XP002386258 [X] 1-5,8,11 * page 169, fourth and and fifth full paragraphs;; figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.380823 | [X] - GRAD LADISLAV ET AL, "Optoacoustic studies of Er:YAG laser ablation in hard dental tissue", PROC SPIE INT SOC OPT ENG; PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING 1994 SOCIETY OF PHOTO-OPTICAL INSTRUMENTATION ENGINEERS, BELLINGHAM, WA, USA, (1994), vol. 2128, pages 456 - 465, XP002386259 [X] 1-5,8,11 * page 464, section 4 'Conclusions';; figure 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.184931 | by applicant | WO02054948 |