EP1962712 - DISPOSABLE SAFETY "PATIENT KIT" FOR MEDICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sgarabottolo, Fabio Via Roma 91 35030 Cervarese S. Croce / IT | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Vinci, Marcello, et al Ufficio Veneto Brevetti Via Sorio 116 35141 Padova / IT | [2008/36] | Application number, filing date | 05850973.8 | 06.12.2005 | [2008/36] | WO2005IT00717 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007066359 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1962712 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1962712 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/02, B65D77/20 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
A61B50/30 (EP,US);
A61B10/0096 (EP,US);
A61B2050/0065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINWEG-SICHERHEITSPATIENTENKIT FÜR MEDIZINPRODUKTE | [2008/36] | English: | DISPOSABLE SAFETY "PATIENT KIT" FOR MEDICAL DEVICES | [2008/36] | French: | BOÎTIER DE SECURITE JETABLE POUR APPAREILS MEDICAUX POUR UN PATIENT | [2010/31] |
Former [2008/36] | "TROUSSE PATIENT" DE SECURITE JETABLE POUR APPAREILS MEDICAUX | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 07.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.10.2010 | CZ | 06.10.2010 | EE | 06.10.2010 | LT | 06.10.2010 | LV | 06.10.2010 | RO | 06.10.2010 | SK | 06.10.2010 | IE | 06.12.2010 | LU | 06.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2010 | LI | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | BG | 06.01.2011 | IS | 06.02.2011 | HU | 07.04.2011 | [2012/44] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
HU | 07.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | LT | 06.10.2010 | |
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | LT | 06.10.2010 | |
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 06.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3806618 (BEMISS R) [Y] 7 * the whole document *; | [XY]US4803048 (NASON FREDERIC L [US]) [X] 1-5,8 * abstract * * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 14 * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 60 * [Y] 7; | [X]US5392917 (ALPERN MARVIN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8 * column 4, lines 30-47; figure - *; | [X]EP0896931 (WESTVACO CORP [US]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0012] , [0014] - [0017]; figure - *; | [X]US6286705 (MIHALOV LORI J [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract ** column 10, lines 15-22 * |