EP1732895 - INSECTICIDAL N-SUBSTITUTED SULFOXIMINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow AgroSciences, LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis Indiana 46268-1054 / US | [2016/46] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states Dow AgroSciences LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis Indiana 46268-1054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Yuanming 13209 Aquamarine Drive Carmel, IN 46033 / US | 02 /
ROGERS, Richard Brewer 250 Saint Anthony Street Mobile, AL 36603 / US | 03 /
HUANG, Jim Xinpei 1538 Old Mill Circle Carmel, IN 46032 / US | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2016/46] |
Former [2006/51] | Böhm, Brigitte, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05851160.1 | 08.04.2005 | [2006/51] | WO2005US11852 | Priority number, date | US20040560628P | 08.04.2004 Original published format: US 560628 P | [2006/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006060029 | Date: | 08.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1732895 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1732895 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/61, C07D409/06, C07D335/02, C07D417/06, C07D333/48, C07D277/32, C07D213/71, A01N43/40, A01N43/10, A01N43/18 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
C07D213/71 (EP,KR,US);
C07D213/61 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/78 (KR);
A01N47/24 (EP,KR,US);
A01N47/40 (EP,KR,US);
A01N51/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07D277/32 (EP,KR,US);
C07D333/48 (EP,KR,US);
C07D335/02 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2016/46] |
Former [2007/04] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | INSEKTIZIDE N-SUBSTITUIERTE SULFOXIMINE | [2006/51] | English: | INSECTICIDAL N-SUBSTITUTED SULFOXIMINES | [2006/51] | French: | SULFOXIMINES N-SUBSTITUÉES INSECTICIDES | [2016/28] |
Former [2006/51] | SULFOXIMINES N-SUBSTITUEES INSECTICIDES | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 01.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1307271 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * example 11; claims 1-3,6-10,31; tables 1,4,5 *; | [A]WO9639389 (RHONE POULENC AGROCHIMIE [FR], et al) [A] 1,7,8* abstract * |