EP1877475 - FOAMING ADDITIVE COMPRISING AN AMPHIPHILIC BLOCK COPOLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phillips Plastics Corporation Corporate Center, Seven Long Lake Drive Phillips, WI 54555 / US | [2008/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CERNOHOUS, Jeffrey, J. 643 Hillary Farm Road Hudson, Wisconsin 54016 / US | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Heumann, Christian Patentanwalt Furtwänglerstrasse 91 70195 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | Heumann, Christian Patentanwalt, Furtwänglerstrasse 91 70195 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05851935.6 | 21.11.2005 | [2008/03] | WO2005US42171 | Priority number, date | US20040630355P | 22.11.2004 Original published format: US 630355 P | US20050641526P | 05.01.2005 Original published format: US 641526 P | US20050675706P | 28.04.2005 Original published format: US 675706 P | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006057965 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1877475 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/04, C08J9/00 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
C08J9/04 (EP,US);
C08J9/0004 (EP,US);
C08J2201/024 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHAUMADDITIV MIT EINEM AMPHIPHILEN BLOCKCOPOLYMER | [2008/03] | English: | FOAMING ADDITIVE COMPRISING AN AMPHIPHILIC BLOCK COPOLYMER | [2008/03] | French: | ADDITIFS MOUSSANTS | [2008/03] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 28.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/47] | 07.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.2008 | 30.11.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5269987 (REEDY MICHAEL E [US], et al) [X] 1 * claim 1 *; | [XY]US2004156933 (MCNAMARA JOHN JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 13, paragraph [0159] - page 15, paragraph [0195] * * page 15, paragraph [0204] * * page 20, paragraph [0252] * * page 20, paragraph [0255] * * claims 10-16 * [Y] 2-25; | [Y]US4940735 (KRESS GERHARD [DE]) [Y] 2-25 * claim - *; | [X]US4892854 (PASTORINO RONALD L [US], et al) [X] 26,27 * examples 7-11; table 2 * * claim 5 *; | [X]US4810570 (RUTTEN HENDRIKUS J J [NL], et al) [X] 28 * column 1, lines 43-46 * * example 1 * * claim 5 *; | [X]US5340843 (TSURUTA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [X] 28 * column 3, lines 19-39; example 1 * * claim 4 *; | [X]US6344268 (STUCKY DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 29 * column 3, lines 22-27 * * claims 1-9 * | Examination | EP0822223 |