EP1814491 - PATIENT SELECTABLE KNEE JOINT ARTHROPLASTY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConforMIS, Inc. 28 Crosby Drive Bedford, MA 01730 / US | [2016/14] |
Former [2012/07] | For all designated states ConforMIS, Inc. 11 North Avenue Burlington, MA 01803 / US | ||
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Conformis, Inc. 11 North Avenue Burlington, MA 01803 / US | ||
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states Conformis, Inc. 2 Fourth Avenue Burlington, MA 01803 / US | ||
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states Conformis, Inc. 323 C Vintage Park Drive Foster City, CA 94402 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURDULIS, Albert, G., Jr. 935 Rockdale Drive San Francisco, CA 94127 / US | 02 /
LANG, Phillip 7 Fair Oaks Terrace Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 03 /
FITZ, Wolfgang 53 Lake Street Sherborn, MA 01770 / US | 04 /
STEINES, Daniel 210 Lincoln Street Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 05 /
TSOUGARAKIS, Konstantinos 879 Rattan Terrace Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 06 /
VARGAS-VORACEK, Rene 1119 Lorne Way Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 07 /
BOUADI, Hacene P.O. Box 60246 Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 08 /
O'REGAN, Cecily, Anne 69 Ovington Drive East Falmouth, MA 02536 / US | 09 /
MILLER, David 10050 Firewood Drive Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2016/13] |
Former [2007/40] | 01 /
BURDULIS, Albert, G., Jr. 935 Rockdale Drive San Francisco, CA 94127 / US | ||
02 /
LANG, Phillip 7 Fair Oaks Terrace Lexington, MA 02421 / US | |||
03 /
FITZ, Wolfgang 53 Lake Street Sherborn, MA 01770 / US | |||
04 /
STEINES, Daniel 3627 Lapine Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | |||
05 /
TSOUGARAKIS, Konstantinos 879 Rattan Terrace Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | |||
06 /
VARGAS-VORACEK, Rene 1119 Lorne Way Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | |||
07 /
BOUADI, Hacene P.O. Box 60246 Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | |||
08 /
O'REGAN, Cecily, Anne 69 Ovington Drive East Falmouth, MA 02536 / US | |||
09 /
MILLER, David 10050 Firewood Drive Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
Former [2007/32] | 01 /
BURDULIS, Albert, G., Jr. 935 Rockdale Drive San Francisco, CA 94127 / US | ||
02 /
LANG, Phillip 36 Fairlawn Lane Lexington, MA 02420 / US | |||
03 /
FITZ, Wolfgang 53 Lake Street Sherborn, MA 01770 / US | |||
04 /
STEINES, Daniel 3627 Lapine Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | |||
05 /
TSOUGARAKIS, Konstantinos 879 Rattan Terrace Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | |||
06 /
VARGAS-VORACEK, Rene 1119 Lorne Way Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | |||
07 /
BOUADI, Hacene P.O. Box 60246 Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | |||
08 /
O'REGAN, Cecily, Anne 69 Ovington Drive East Falmouth, MA 02536 / US | |||
09 /
MILLER, David 10050 Firewood Drive Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/43] | Grund, Martin GRUND Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/32] | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05852055.2 | 22.11.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005US42421 | Priority number, date | US20040997407 | 24.11.2004 Original published format: US 997407 | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006058057 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1814491 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1814491 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/38 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
A61F2/38 (EP,US);
A61F2/3859 (US);
A61F2/30942 (EP,US);
A61F2/4657 (EP,US);
A61B5/4504 (EP,US);
A61B5/4514 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/16] |
Former [2007/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PATIENTENABHÄNGIGE ARTHROPLASTIEVORRICHTUNGEN FÜR DAS KNIEGELENK | [2007/32] | English: | PATIENT SELECTABLE KNEE JOINT ARTHROPLASTY DEVICES | [2007/32] | French: | DISPOSITIFS D'ARTHROPLASTIE DE L'ARTICULATION DU GENOU, SELECTIONNALBES SELON LE PATIENT | [2007/32] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 09.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.03.2015 | 12.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10192339.9 / EP2324799 | EP15158570.0 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 14.04.2015 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 02.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.09.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.11.2005 | AT | 20.04.2016 | BE | 20.04.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | CZ | 20.04.2016 | DK | 20.04.2016 | EE | 20.04.2016 | ES | 20.04.2016 | FI | 20.04.2016 | IS | 20.04.2016 | IT | 20.04.2016 | LT | 20.04.2016 | LV | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | NL | 20.04.2016 | PL | 20.04.2016 | RO | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | SI | 20.04.2016 | SK | 20.04.2016 | TR | 20.04.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | IE | 22.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | FR | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 22.11.2005 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
IE | 22.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 22.11.2005 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
IE | 22.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 22.11.2005 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
IE | 22.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
IE | 22.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 20.04.2016 | |
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 20.04.2016 | Cited in | Examination | US6342075 | WO03099106 | US2004102851 | US2004138754 | US2004204760 | WO2005067521 |