EP1845938 - METHODS AND RELATED COMPOSITIONS FOR REDUCTION OF FAT AND SKIN TIGHTENING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Los Angeles Biomedical Research Institute at Harbor-UCLA Medical Center 1124 West Carson Street Torrance, CA 90250-2064 / US | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2019/14] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states Los Angeles Biomedical Research Institute at Harbor-UCLA Medical Center 1124 West Carson Street Torrance, CA 90250-2064 / US | ||
For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 12th Floor 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOLODNEY, Michael S. 2343 Lakeside Estates Morgantown, WV 26508 / US | 02 /
ROTUNDA, Adam M. 50 Townsend Irvine, CA 92620 / US | [2019/16] |
Former [2007/43] | 01 /
KOLODNEY, Michael S. 5625 Crescent Park West 417 Los Angeles, CA 90094 / US | ||
02 /
ROTUNDA, Adam, M. 3290 Sawtelle Boulevard 307 Los Angeles, CA 90066 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/14] |
Former [2013/19] | Gibson, Mark, et al Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | ||
Former [2013/07] | Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | ||
Former [2010/41] | Gibson, Mark, et al Sagittarius IP Taylor House 39 High Street Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1AF / GB | ||
Former [2007/43] | Sexton, Jane Helen J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05852147.7 | 23.11.2005 | [2007/43] | WO2005US42665 | Priority number, date | US20050054171 | 08.02.2005 Original published format: US 54171 | US20050134727 | 19.05.2005 Original published format: US 134727 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006086038 | Date: | 17.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1845938 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1845938 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1845938 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/08, A61K31/575, A61P3/04, A61P3/06 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
A61Q19/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/20 (KR);
A61K31/185 (EP,US);
A61K31/56 (EP,US);
A61K31/685 (EP,US);
A61K47/24 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/63 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P29/02 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/185, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/56, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/685, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/43] | A61K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/14] |
Former [2007/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND DAMIT VERBUNDENE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR FETTREDUZIERUNG UND HAUTSTRAFFUNG | [2007/43] | English: | METHODS AND RELATED COMPOSITIONS FOR REDUCTION OF FAT AND SKIN TIGHTENING | [2007/43] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS ASSOCIÉES PERMETTANT DE RÉDUIRE DES DÉPÔTS GRAISSEUX ET DE RETENDRE LA PEAU | [2018/42] |
Former [2007/43] | METHODES ET COMPOSITIONS ASSOCIEES PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE DES DEPOTS GRAISSEUX ET DE RETENDRE LA PEAU | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 09.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.09.2018 | 14.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 29.03.2019 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2005 | CY | 03.04.2019 | CZ | 03.04.2019 | EE | 03.04.2019 | LT | 03.04.2019 | LV | 03.04.2019 | MC | 03.04.2019 | RO | 03.04.2019 | SI | 03.04.2019 | SK | 03.04.2019 | TR | 03.04.2019 | BG | 03.07.2019 | GR | 04.07.2019 | IS | 03.08.2019 | IE | 23.11.2019 | LU | 23.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
IE | 23.11.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
IE | 23.11.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 03.04.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4158707 (STEFFEN HANS, et al) [X] 1-15,49-52 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 64 * * column 3, lines 11-29 * * column 5; example 9 * * claims 1-7 *; | [X]US4664910 (CASERIO DOMENICO [IT], et al) [X] 16,18-24,28,29 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 24 * * column 4, line 14 - column 5, line 6 * * claims 1-3 *; | [X]CA2033725 (HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG) [X] 1-29 * page 1, line 6 - page 4, line 29 * * page 5 - page 11; examples 1-8 * * claims 1-8 *; | [X]US2002107291 (DE TOMMASO VINCENZO [IT]) [X] 1-15,49-52 * page 1, paragraphs 5,15-17,21 * * page 4, paragraphs 66-69; examples 2,3 *; | [EL]WO2005112942 (LOS ANGELES BIOMED RES INST [US], et al) [EL] 1-41,43-52 * page 3, paragraph 15 - page 4, paragraph 18 * * page 8, paragraph 42 - page 10, paragraph 47 * * page 16, paragraph 77 * * page 29, paragraph 134 * * page 31, paragraph 143 * * page 32, paragraph 153 - page 33, paragraph 158 ** claims 1-53 *; | [X] - ROTUNDA A M ET AL, "Detergent effects of sodium deoxycholate are a major feature of an injectable phosphatidylcholine formulation used for localized fat dissolution", DERMATOLOGIC SURGERY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200407), vol. 30, no. 7, ISSN 1076-0512, pages 1001 - 1008, XP002331643 [X] 1-52 * abstract * * page 1002, column R, paragraph 3 * * page 1003, column R, paragraph 2 - page 1004, column R, paragraph L * * page 1007, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1524-4725.2004.30305.x | [PX] - DUNCAN ET AL, "Lipodissolve for subcutaneous fat reduction and skin retraction", AESTHETIC SURGERY JOURNAL, MOSBY-YEAR BOOK, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, (200509), vol. 25, no. 5, ISSN 1090-820X, pages 530 - 543, XP005119622 [PX] 1-52 * abstract * * page 530, column R, paragraph 3 * * page 531, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 531, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 532, column R, paragraph L - page 536, column L, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.asj.2005.07.009 |