EP1817058 - COMPOSITION FOR USE IN IMPROVING LIVER CLEARANCE OF XENOBIOTIC SUBSTANCES IN AN ANIMAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/33] | METHODS FOR IMPROVING LIVER CLEARANCE OF XENOBIOTIC SUBSTANCES IN AN ANIMAL | ||
[2013/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. 400 Southwest 8th Avenue Topeka, KS 66603 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/36] | For all designated states Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. 400 Southwest 8th Street Topeka, KS 66603 / US | ||
Former [2007/33] | For all designated states Hill's Pet Nutrition Inc. 400 Southwest 8th Street Topeka, KS 66603 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZICKER, Steven, Curtis 3017 Oxford Road Lawrence, Kansas 66049 / US | 02 /
PAETAU-ROBINSON, Inke 7530 Sw 69th Street Auburn, Kansas 66402 / US | [2007/33] | Representative(s) | Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/36] | Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2007/33] | Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 05852254.1 | 23.11.2005 | [2007/33] | WO2005US42886 | Priority number, date | US20040630971P | 24.11.2004 Original published format: US 630971 P | [2007/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006058278 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1817058 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1817058 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/00, A23K1/16, A23K1/18 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
A61K31/385 (EP,US);
A23K20/121 (EP,US);
A23K20/158 (EP,US);
A23K50/40 (EP,US);
A23K50/42 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/33] | A61K47/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/36] |
Former [2007/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG DER VERBESSERUNG DER BESEITIGUNG VON XENOBIOTISCHEN SUBSTANZEN AUS DER LEBER BEI EINEM TIER | [2013/17] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR USE IN IMPROVING LIVER CLEARANCE OF XENOBIOTIC SUBSTANCES IN AN ANIMAL | [2013/17] | French: | COMPOSITION DESTINEE A ETRE UTILISEE POUR FACILITER LE DECHARGEMENT DU FOIE D'UN ANIMAL DES SUBSTANCES XENOBIOTIQUES | [2013/17] |
Former [2007/33] | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER BESEITIGUNG VON XENOBIOTISCHEN SUBSTANZEN AUS DER LEBER BEI EINEM TIER | ||
Former [2007/33] | METHODS FOR IMPROVING LIVER CLEARANCE OF XENOBIOTIC SUBSTANCES IN AN ANIMAL | ||
Former [2007/33] | PROCEDES DESTINES A FACILITER LE DECHARGEMENT DU FOIE D'UN ANIMAL DES SUBSTANCES XENOBIOTIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 21.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2005 | AT | 02.09.2015 | BG | 02.09.2015 | CY | 02.09.2015 | EE | 02.09.2015 | FI | 02.09.2015 | LT | 02.09.2015 | LV | 02.09.2015 | MC | 02.09.2015 | PL | 02.09.2015 | RO | 02.09.2015 | SE | 02.09.2015 | SI | 02.09.2015 | SK | 02.09.2015 | TR | 02.09.2015 | IE | 23.11.2015 | LU | 23.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | GR | 03.12.2015 | IS | 02.01.2016 | PT | 04.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 23.11.2005 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
BG | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.11.2015 | ||
LU | 23.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | HU | 23.11.2005 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
BG | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.11.2015 | ||
LU | 23.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.11.2015 | ||
IT | 23.11.2015 | ||
LU | 23.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.11.2015 | ||
LU | 23.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.11.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 02.09.2015 | |
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 02.09.2015 | |
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 02.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002006907 (GARDINER PAUL [CA], et al) [X] 16-20 * claims 8, 16 *; | [XDY]US2002076469 (ZICKER STEVEN CURTIS [US], et al) [XD] 16-20 * example 1; claims 1, 2, 8 * [Y] 1-15,21; | [X]US2003224061 (PACIORETTY LINDA M [US], et al) [X] 16 * claims 1, 2 *; | [Y] - Beth M. Ley, "Alpha Lipoic Acid", (20000614), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20000614235007/http://www.tldp.com/issue/160/160alpha.htm, (20120525), XP002676684 [Y] 1-15,21 * paragraphs [0008] , [ 0013] * | [A] - BERKSON B M, "A conservative triple antioxidant approach to the treatment of hepatitis C. Combination of alpha lipoic acid (thioctic acid), silymarin, and selenium: three case histories", MEDLINE,, (19991015), XP002567154 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5624896 (AXWORTHY DONALD B [US], et al); | [X]US2002076469 (ZICKER STEVEN CURTIS [US], et al); | [X]US6914071 (ZICKER STEVEN CURTIS [US], et al) | by applicant | US2002006907 | US2003224061 |