EP1887938 - DETERMINING RESPIRATORY OR CIRCULATORY HEALTH CONDITION IN ANIMALS FOR IMPROVED MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mwi Veterinary Supply Co. 651 South Stratford, Suite 100 Meridian, ID 83642 / US | [2012/32] |
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states Micro Beef Technologies, Ltd. PO Box 9262 Amarillo TX 79105 / US | ||
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states HAYNES, John T. 5724 Mary Dell Drive Amarillo TX 79109 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haynes, John T. 5724 Mary Dell Drive Amarillo, TX 79109 / US | [2008/11] |
Former [2008/08] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/08] | Walker, Ross Thomson Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05852562.7 | 30.11.2005 | [2008/08] | WO2005US43371 | Priority number, date | US20040631646P | 30.11.2004 Original published format: US 631646 P | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006060511 | Date: | 08.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1887938 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, A61B8/12, A61B8/00, G01G13/24, G01G23/37, // A61B7/00, A61B6/00 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
A61B8/08 (EP,US);
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
G01G13/24 (EP,US);
G01G23/3735 (EP,US);
G16H30/40 (EP);
G16H50/20 (EP);
A61B6/508 (EP,US);
A61B7/003 (EP,US);
A61B8/0858 (EP,US);
A61B8/4281 (EP,US);
A61B8/4422 (EP,US);
A61B8/56 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/08] | A61B8/00, A61B8/12, A61B8/02, A61B8/14, A61B8/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIE BESTIMMUNG DES GESUNDHEITSZUSTANDS HINSICHTLICH DER ATEMWEGE ODER DES BLUTKREISLAUFS IN TIEREN FÜR EINE VERBESSERTE HALTUNG | [2008/08] | English: | DETERMINING RESPIRATORY OR CIRCULATORY HEALTH CONDITION IN ANIMALS FOR IMPROVED MANAGEMENT | [2008/08] | French: | DETECTION DE TROUBLES DE SANTE AU NIVEAU RESPIRATOIRE ET CIRCULATOIRE CHEZ DES ANIMAUX, POUR UNE MEILLEURE GESTION | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 30.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/13] | 13.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.12.2007 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | IS   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | LT   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | LV   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.12.2007 | M02   Fee paid on   03.12.2007 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2001044579 (PRATT WILLIAM C [US]) [X] 8,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0059] , [0063] , [0064] * * paragraphs [0069] , [0072] * * figure 5 * [Y] 10; | [X]US2002115915 (PRATT WILLIAM C [US], et al) [X] 8,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] ** figures 1-4 *; | [XYI]US2004023612 (KRIESEL MARSHALL S [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0165] , [0244] , [0303] * * paragraphs [0309] , [0316] , [0320] * * paragraphs [0420] , [0421] , [0583] * * paragraph [0585] * * figures 2-1,2-2A,2-2B * [Y] 10 [I] 4 | International search | [A]US2005049498 (ROCHE ROBERT H [US], et al); | [AP]US2005257748 (KRIESEL MARSHALL S [US], et al); | [AE]US2006201432 (PRATT WILLIAM C [US]) | by applicant | US5315505 | US5673647 | - U. BRAUN ET AL., "Ultrasonographic Findings in Cattle with Pleuropneumonia", VET. REC., (1997), vol. 141, pages 12 - 17 | - U. BRAUN ET AL., "Ultrasonography of the Lungs, Pleura, and Mediastinum in Healthy Cows", AM, J. VET. RES., (1996), vol. 57, no. 4, pages 432 - 8 |