EP1827216 - DEVICE FOR NON-SURGICAL CORRECTION OF CONGENITAL INVERTED NIPPLES AND/OR COLLECTION OF NIPPLE ASPIRATE FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WANG, Paul C. 115 East 9th Street 18L New York, New York 10003 / US | For all designated states MCCONNELL, Kathleen Ann M.D. 300 East 33rd Street 3F New York, New York 10016 / US | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Rösler, Uwe Rösler Patentanwaltskanzlei Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | Rösler, Uwe Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05852631.0 | 02.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US43467 | Priority number, date | US20040634222P | 08.12.2004 Original published format: US 634222 P | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006062802 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1827216 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, B65D81/00 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
A61H9/005 (EP,US);
A61M1/062 (EP,US);
A61M1/0697 (EP);
A61M1/08 (EP,US);
A61M1/81 (EP,US);
A61H2205/082 (EP,US);
A61J13/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE NICHT-CHIRURGISCHE KORREKTUR VON ANGEBORENEN EINGEZOGENEN BRUSTWARZEN UND/ODER SAMMLUNG VON BRUSTWARZEN-ASPIRATFLÜSSIGKEIT | [2007/36] | English: | DEVICE FOR NON-SURGICAL CORRECTION OF CONGENITAL INVERTED NIPPLES AND/OR COLLECTION OF NIPPLE ASPIRATE FLUID | [2007/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CORRECTION NON CHIRURGICALE D'UNE INVAGINATION DU MAMELON ET/OU DE COLLECTE DE FLUIDE D'ASPIRATION DU MAMELON | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 27.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/42] | 31.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2325411 (UNIV LONDON [GB]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP0988868 (SOULAS YVES [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]US3786801 (SARTORIUS O); | [A]US5871456 (ARMSTRONG EDIE C [US], et al); | [A]US6689073 (QUAY STEVEN C [US]) |