EP1830638 - COMPOSITIONS HAVING A HIGH ANTIVIRAL AND ANTIBACTERIAL EFFICACY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dial Corporation 15101 North Scottsdale Road Scottsdale, AZ 85254-2199 / US | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAYLOR, Timothy, J. 1205 West Ducasse Drive Phoenix, Arizona 85013 / US | 02 /
THEILER, Richard, Fredric 10409 East Laurel Lane Scottsdale, Arizona 85259 / US | 03 /
SEITZ, Earl, P., Jr. 9753 East Windrose Drive Scottsdale, Arizona 85260 / US | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Semrau, Markus Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Patente (FJP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Semrau, Markus Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Patente (FJP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | Fiussello, Francesco, et al Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 05852832.4 | 05.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005US43720 | Priority number, date | US20040634465P | 09.12.2004 Original published format: US 634465 P | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006062835 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1830638 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01N31/16, A01N25/30, A01N37/40, A01N25/04, A01N37/36, A01N25/02, A01N37/10, A01P1/00, A01N37/04 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
A01N31/16 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N31/16, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N31/16, A01N37/40, A01N37/36, A01N37/04, A01N25/30 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT STARKER ANTIVIRALER UND ANTIBAKTERIELLER WIRKSAMKEIT | [2007/37] | English: | COMPOSITIONS HAVING A HIGH ANTIVIRAL AND ANTIBACTERIAL EFFICACY | [2007/37] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PRESENTANT UNE EFFICACITE ANTIVIRALE ET ANTIBACTERIENNE ELEVEE | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 07.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/01] | 19.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0259249 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1,4-15,17-25,28,29,38,40-45,47-49,52,53 * page 2, line 3 - line 4 * * page 2, line 34 - line 47 * * page 2, line 51 * * page 6, line 5 - line 7 * * examples 1,24-26 *; | [Y]US4975217 (BROWN-SKROBOT SUSAN K [US], et al) [Y] 1-29,38-53 * column 1, line 17 - line 21 * * column 1, line 35 - line 38 * * column 4, line 42 - line 54 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 18 * * column 4, line 51 - line 55 * * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 34 * * column 7, line 23 - line 44 * * column 10, line 51 - line 66 * * column 12, line 34 - line 35 * * tables I-XVI *; | [X]WO9606152 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [X] 53 * page 1, paragraph 4 * * page 9, line 2 * * page 9 - page 10; examples 2,3 *; | [Y]US6107261 (TAYLOR TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [Y] 1-53 * column 1, line 6 - line 13 * * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 61 * * column 5, line 36 - column 16, line 61 * * examples 14,18 *; | [A]WO0078275 (DIAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-53 * claims 11-24 *; | [A]WO0078141 (DIAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-53* claims 1-20 *; | [Y]US6217887 (BEERSE PETER WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-53 * column 1, line 18 - line 22 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 17 * * column 4, line 23 - column 7, line 32 * * column 7, line 66 - column 13, line 14 * * column 13, line 21 - line 30 * * column 14, line 12 - line 30 *; | [Y]WO0128340 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-25,28-53 * page 1, line 4 - line 6 * * page 1, line 17 - page 2, line 34 * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 10 * * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 26 * * page 7, line 7 - page 8, line 30 * * page 19, line 20 - line 25 * * page 20, line 20 - page 22, line 9 * * page 22, line 22 - page 28, line 29 * * page 50, line 1 - line 30 *; | [Y]WO0128338 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-27,38-53 * page 1, line 4 - line 7 * * page 1, line 17 - page 2, line 34 * * page 3, line 24 - page 6, line 34 * * page 8, line 11 - page 9, line 34 * * page 11, line 31 - page 12, line 19 * * page 20, line 22 - line 27 * * page 21, line 23 - page 29, line 33 * * page 51, line 3 - line 30 *; | [Y]US2001053378 (CHILAKOS JOHN [US]) [Y] 1-29,38-53 * the whole document *; | [A]US6451748 (TAYLOR TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [A] 1-53 * claims 1,12 *; | [Y]WO2004000016 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-53 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 6 * * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 14, paragraph 2 * * page 16, paragraph 1 - page 17, paragraph 1 * * page 18, paragraph 3 - page 20, paragraph 1 *; | [A]WO2004004677 (DIAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-53 * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2004021786 (MENNO CHEMIE VERTRIEB GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-27,38-53 * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph 1 * |